Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kai N Scott
Case #: 2:24-cv-02109
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1691 Equal Credit Opportunity Act
Case Filed:May 14, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2024 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
Goldman Sachs Bank USA
Represented By
Steven Strauss
Philadelphia
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMAL BERRY
1400 N. 16TH STREET APT B-8
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19121


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 03/26 12:44 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 3/26/25. 3/26/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/19 11:17 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BY PLAINTIFF JAMAL BERRY against DEFENDANT GOLDMAN SACHES BANK USA.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/18 4:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/2/2025 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 13B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT. DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/18/2025. MOTIONS DUE BY 4/18/2025. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 8/26/2025. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 4/18/2025. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/26/2025. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/26/2025. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 9/9/2025.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 12/18/2024. 12/18/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 12/18 12:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTTin Courtroom 13B Interim Pretrial Conference held on 12/18/2024. (sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
17 17 misc Report Of Wed 12/11 12:43 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by Goldman Sachs Bank USA. (Strauss, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 11/12 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/18/2024 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 13B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 RULE 26F FORM
Thursday, October 24, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 10/25 9:22 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III TO DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/24/2024. 10/25/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
14 14 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 10/18 3:54 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kingsley C. Nwamah by Goldman Sachs Bank USA. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17821380.). (Strauss, Steven)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/18 3:47 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.(Strauss, Steven)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 10/18 3:41 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. with Certificate of Service by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.(Strauss, Steven)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Strauss on behalf of Goldman Sachs Bank USA with Certificate of Service(Strauss, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Wed 10/16 10:39 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jamal Berry re: served Complaint upon Simon Ungureanu by Personal on 09/27/24(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/01 9:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMAL BERRY re: US MARSHAL served Summons and Complaint upon Goldman Sachs Bank USA by SIMON UNGUREANU ACCEPTED SERVICE ON BEHALF OF GOLDMAN SACHS. Goldman Sachs Bank USA served on 9/27/2024, answer due 10/18/2024. (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 07/01 12:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Forwarded To: U.S. MARSHAL on 7/1/2024, WITH COMPLETED USM 285 FORM AND COPY OF COMPLAINT. (sg)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs order Order Mon 07/01 12:45 PM
ORDERED THAT: 1. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE A SUMMONS FOR THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANT: A. GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA 2. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FORWARD THE SUMMONS, COMPLETED USM-285 FORM, AND A COPY OF THE GOVERNING COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 2) TO THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS FURTHER DIRECTED TO RECORD THIS EVENT ON THE DOCKET. 3. THE 90-DAY TIME PERIOD TO SERVE PROCESS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(M) IS EXTENDED TO THE DATE THE CLERKS OFFICE FORWARDS THE USM-285 FORM, THE COMPLAINT, AND THE SUMMONS TO THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/1/2024. 7/1/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
6 6 misc US Marshal 285 Form Tue 06/25 8:49 AM
US Marshal 285 Form.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COVER SHEET
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
misc Remark Wed 06/05 8:01 AM
PAPER #5 MAILED WITH 285 FORM (JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 06/04 9:40 AM
ORDERED THAT: 1.LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED.2.THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED.3.THE CASE SHALL PROCEED AT THIS TIME TO SERVICE BY THE U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. § 1915(D) AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(C)(3), AGAINST THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANT: A. GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA 4.IN ANTICIPATION OF SERVICE BY THE U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE, THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO BERRY TOGETHER WITH ONE COPY OF THE U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE OF PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN FORM USM-285 (USM-285 FORM) FOR EACH DEFENDANT LISTED IN PARAGRAPH THREE (3) OF THIS ORDER.1 THE CLERK OF COURT IS FURTHER DIRECTED TO RECORD THE MAILING ON THE DOCKET. 8. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET ANY USM-285 FORMS THAT BERRY RETURNS IN THIS CASE. 9. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED NOT TO ISSUE SUMMONSES AT THIS TIME. THE COURT WILL DIRECT ISSUANCE OF SUMMONSES UPON RECEIPT OF PROPERLY COMPLETED USM-285 FORMS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 6/3/2024.6/4/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
4 4 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Fri 05/17 11:43 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/17 11:35 AM
NOTICE TO DEFEND by JAMAL BERRY (sg)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 05/17 11:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Goldman Sachs Bank USA, filed by JAMAL BERRY.(sg) (sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/17/2024) COVER LETTER
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/17 11:15 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JAMAL BERRY..(sg)
Related: [-]