California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:24-cv-04115
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, December 23, 2024
19 19 othcmp Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 12/27 2:52 PM
NEW WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Civil and Constitutional Torts Complaint filed by Petitioner Rod Anthony Huff, Jr.(hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
18 18 misc Mail Returned Fri 12/20 6:51 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Rod Anthony Huff, Jr. re Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form16 . (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12/06 12:24 PM
APPOINTMENT FOR COUNSEL filed by Petitioner Rod Anthony Huff, Jr. (hr)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 12/06 12:21 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Amended Complaint15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Plaintiff is filing a amended complaint on a Writ of Habeas Corpus case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
Related: [-]
15 15 othcmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/06 12:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT - Petition for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Petitioner Rod Anthony Huff, Jr.(hr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/27 10:30 AM
NOTICE to the Court Clerk filed by Petitioner Rod Anthony Huff. (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
13 13 othcmp Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 06/21 12:11 PM
AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against Respondent Los Angeles County Superior Court, amending Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus1 , filed by Petitioner Rod Anthony Huff(hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
12 12 misc Declaration Fri 06/14 10:03 AM
DECLARATION of Rod filed by Petitioner Rod Anthony Huff. (hr)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Certificate of Appealability - Order of USDC Tue 06/11 10:54 AM
ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATEOF APPEALABILITY by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: (See attached order) (jm)
Related: [-]
9 9 judgmentCV Judgment Tue 06/11 10:50 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons set forth in the related Order Dismissing Action. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jm)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Dismissing Case Tue 06/11 10:46 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: IT IS ORDERED that the Petition is dismissed without prejudice. (See attached order) (jm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
11 11 misc Affidavit Thu 06/13 1:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF RESERVATIONS - NOTICE OF LIENS IMPOSED filed by Petitioner Rod Anthony Huff (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Fri 05/31 11:51 AM
LETTER and NOTICE of Change of Address to CA ID No. E1833070, Patton State Hospital, 3102 E. Highland Ave., Patton, CA 92369 from Petitioner Rod Anthony Huff (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
6 6 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/21 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: The Standing Order filed at docket entry 4 was inadvertently issued. The Standing Order is stricken. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form Tue 05/21 10:17 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
4 4 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 05/20 2:07 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
3 3 notice Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111) Fri 05/17 11:59 AM
Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111). Upon submission of your petition for writ of habeas corpus, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),1 (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
2 2 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Fri 05/17 11:57 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed CCA # 24-2824 Rod Anthony Huff, a California pretrial detainee, has filed a petition for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241. When a petition for writ of habeas corpus is filed in the court of appeals, the application must be transferred to the appropriate district court. Fed. R. App. P. 22(a); see 28 U.S.C. §§ 1631, 2241(b). The Clerk will transfer the petition at Docket Entry No. 1 to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. The petition is deemed filed on April 25, 2024, the date it was signed. The Clerk will also serve this order on the district court. Upon transfer of the petition, the Clerk will close this original action. PETITION TRANSFERRED to the district court. (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Fri 05/17 11:33 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver.(Filing fee $ 5 DUE), filed by Petitioner Rod Anthony Huff. (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2 of Petition