Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00232
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 11, 2024 1:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Heather Bergdahl (1)
Represented By
Kevin Hasenfang
Jones Day
contact info
Bethany Kaye Biesenthal
Jones Day
contact info
Taylor M Grode
Jones Day
contact info
Jordan Melissa Matthews
Jones Day - Chicago
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sheri H. Mecklenburg
Assistant United States Attorney
contact info
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Pretrial Services
contact info
Kelly Lynn Guzman
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/27/2024 8:31 AM CST
Friday, May 10, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT signed by Honorable Maria Valdez as to Heather Bergdahl (1). (rc, )
Related: [-]
2 2 ARREST WARRANT issued to U.S. Marshal as to Heather Bergdahl. (rc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Heather Bergdahl by Jordan Melissa Matthews (Matthews, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
4 4 INDICTMENT as to Heather Bergdahl (1) count(s) 1-11 (emc, )
Related: [-]
5 5 DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 3). (emc, )
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for USA byKelly Lynn Guzman (Guzman, Kelly)
Related: [-]