Member Case
Lead case is: 6:24-bk-02486

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Grace E Robson
Case #: 6:24-bk-02487
Case Filed:May 19, 2024
Terminated:Dec 27, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Red Lobster Restaurants LLC
450 S Orange Ave Ste 800
Orlando, FL 32801-3344
Represented By
Paul Steven Singerman
Berger Singerman, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
25 25 claims Withdrawal of Claim Tue 04/08 3:10 PM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): re: Claim No 11882 Filed by Creditor Department of Taxation and Finance. (Adrienne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
24 24 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Tue 12/31 4:40 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Final Decree and Order Closing All Cases, Except for the RLSV, Inc. Case, and Amending the Case Caption to Reflect the Remaining Case Filed by Debtor Red Lobster Restaurants LLC Related [+]. (Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC (SJG))
Related: [-] 23
Friday, December 27, 2024
23 23 order Final Decree - Chapter 11 Fri 12/27 9:10 AM
Final Decree and Order Closing All Cases, Except for the RLSV, Inc. Case, and Amending the Case Caption to Reflect the Remaining Case . Service Instructions: Paul Singerman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Bonilla, Adrienne). Related document(s)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 12/27 9:12 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Adrienne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
22 22 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Fri 12/20 11:27 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Robin Rubens, Nicolette Vilmos, Michael Fishel, Brooke Bean (Debtor Atty); Scott Bomkamp (US Trustee Atty); Lorne Durket (Diaz Atty); Sam Hess (Rainner Atty); Catherine Heitzenrater, Phil Hudson (Zurich Atty); Allyson Kisiel (Morris Atty); RULING: Debtor's Motion for Final Decree (Doc #20) - Granted:Order by RUBENS; (gww). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Thu 12/05 12:04 PM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Final Decree Closing All Cases Except for the RLSV, Inc. Case by December 31, 2024, and Certificate of Substantial Consummation in Connection Therewith; For Relief From Local Rule 3022-1; to Amend Case Caption to Reflect Remaining Case; and Granting Related Relief (Hearing Requested for December 19, 2024, at 1:30 P.M.) Filed by Robin J. Rubens on behalf of Debtor Red Lobster Restaurants LLC, Other Prof. Mark Smith Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2024 at 01:30 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street . (Rubens, Robin)
Related: [-] 20
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Thu 12/05 11:09 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 12/19/2024 01:30 PM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion for Final Decree Closing All Cases Except for the RLSV, Inc. Case by December 31, 2024, and Certificate of Substantial Consummation in Connection Therewith; For Relief From Local Rule 3022-1; to Amend Case Caption to Reflect Remaining Case; and Granting Related Relief (Hearing Requested for December 19, 2024, at 1:30 P.M.) Doc20 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Robin J. Rubens to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 20
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
20 20 motion Motion for Final Decree Wed 12/04 4:12 PM
Motion for Final Decree Closing All Cases Except for the RLSV, Inc. Case by December 31, 2024, and Certificate of Substantial Consummation in Connection Therewith; For Relief From Local Rule 3022-1; to Amend Case Caption to Reflect Remaining Case; and Granting Related Relief (Hearing Requested for December 19, 2024, at 1:30 P.M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
19 19 claims Withdrawal of Claim Fri 11/01 10:19 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 44 -1 and 44-2-will be refiled under correct entity Filed by Charles M Tatelbaum on behalf of Creditor RYG Realty Inc.. (Tatelbaum, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/02 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #17 )
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order Striking Tue 07/30 11:57 AM
Order Striking Notice of Appearance Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Nadia)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, July 26, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 07/26 3:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jennifer Kreder on behalf of Creditor Ipsos-Insight, LLC. (Kreder, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 07/26 1:06 PM
Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jennifer Kreder on behalf of Creditor Ipsos-Insight, LLC. (Kreder, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
court Request for Audio Recording of Proceeding Thu 07/25 10:48 AM
Request for Audio Recording of Proceeding. Proceeding held: 7/26/2024. (Accredited Court Reporters (CV))
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 07/10 12:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael A Paasch on behalf of Creditor SWR-LV, LLC. (Paasch, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
13 13 misc Equity Security Holders Fri 06/21 1:08 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Debtor Red Lobster Restaurants LLC. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules) Fri 06/21 1:07 PM
Schedules A - H, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, and Statement of Financial Affairs Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Debtor Red Lobster Restaurants LLC. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/23 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
10 10 misc Request for Notice Wed 05/22 8:07 AM
Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Manatee County Tax Collector (ML). (Manatee County Tax Collector (ML))
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
9 9 claims Withdrawal of Claim Mon 05/20 4:28 PM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 1 Filed by Scott Andron on behalf of Creditor Broward County. (Andron, Scott)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Joint Administration Mon 05/20 2:54 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration . This case is associated with lead case 6:24-bk-2486. Related [+]. Service Instructions: Paul Singerman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Adrienne)
Related: [-] 5
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 05/20 11:56 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Scott Andron on behalf of Creditor Broward County. (Andron, Scott)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business Mon 05/20 8:58 AM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Motion for Joint Administration Mon 05/20 12:40 AM
Related: [-]
court (NO PAPER) - Notice of Consolidation/Joint Administration of Cases Mon 05/20 2:56 PM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case with the exception of Lists of Creditors, Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs and any amendments thereto, Proofs of Claim, Ballots (if separate Plans are filed in the jointly administered cases), and Motions for Final Decree, pursuant to Local Rule 1015-1(c)(3). All other papers should be docketed in the lead Case No. 6:24-bk-02486-GER Related [+]. (Adrienne)
Related: [-] 8
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Mon 05/20 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 19, 2024
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Sun 05/19 11:17 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Debtor Red Lobster Restaurants LLC. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Sun 05/19 11:16 PM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Debtor Red Lobster Restaurants LLC. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Sun 05/19 11:15 PM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors (Consolidated List of Creditors Who Have the 30 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders) Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Debtor Red Lobster Restaurants LLC. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 05/19 10:24 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Red Lobster Restaurants LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/16/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 09/16/2024. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verification of Creditor Matrix
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Sun 05/19 11:25 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:24-bk-02487] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A75463692, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
assign Assign Judge to Electronically Filed Cases Sun 05/19 10:55 PM
Assignment of the Honorable Grace E. Robson, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Kathy D.)
Related: [-]