Onset Fire District Water Department v. Tyco Fire Products LP, et al.
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Leo T Sorokin |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-11323 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday May 20, 2024 10:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
AGC INC. F/K/A ASAHI GLASS CO.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION F/K/A UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NATION FORD CHEMICAL COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DYNAX CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
DOE DEFENDANTS, JOHN 1-49
|
|
Defendant
DEEPWATER CHEMICAS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CLARIANT CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
CHUBB FIRE, LTD.
|
|
Defendant
CHEMICALS INCORPORATED
|
|
Defendant
CHEMDESIGN PRODUCTS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ARCHROMA U.S., INC.
|
|
Defendant
AGC CHEMICAL AMERICAS INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
ONSET FIRE DISTRICT WATER DEPARTMENT
|
Docket last updated: 06/14/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
State Court Record - no answer filed in state court
Thu 05/23 2:06 PM
STATE COURT Record. (Jeffrey, Jessica) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 05/22 9:37 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 05/21 11:14 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Jeffrey, Jessica) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Mon 05/20 5:25 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Warnock, Douglas) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 05/20 11:47 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/20 9:21 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Jeffrey, Jessica) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 05/20 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10424056 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Jeffrey, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |