SM LLC v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Matthew F Kennelly |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-04129 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:44 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 20, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 4:39 AM CST |
Defendant
Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
|
|
Defendant
AIBEYOU
|
|
Defendant
AIEIKSIX
|
|
Defendant
AOBOBEIYE
|
|
Defendant
AQUASHIELDING
|
|
Defendant
AYAN FASHION STORE
|
|
Defendant
Abdul Jalloh
|
|
Defendant
Allbottle
|
|
Defendant
Aqua Watts
|
|
Defendant
BEAU HOME
|
|
Defendant
BEREKAI
|
|
Defendant
BOKI tech
|
|
Defendant
Besot crystal
|
|
Defendant
Binzhouyucong
|
|
Defendant
Binzou
|
|
Defendant
Bomingrui Store
|
|
Defendant
Butter Cat
|
|
Defendant
CROST
|
|
Defendant
Chocohuixin
|
|
Defendant
CloudCart
|
|
Defendant
DQianQ
|
|
Defendant
Daisy and Lucy
|
|
Defendant
Dedicated To Comfort
|
|
Defendant
Drinkware Designs
|
|
Defendant
Duvisi
|
|
Defendant
E-C Mega Store
|
|
Defendant
Ecom-Home
|
|
Defendant
Ewixni
|
|
Defendant
FANG SHUANGYAN
|
|
Defendant
Fengwan Electronic commerce
|
|
Defendant
Flying Clothing
|
|
Defendant
GEMFUL
|
|
Defendant
GlFUBOWA
|
|
Defendant
GoSmart1
|
|
Defendant
HNHEMING
|
|
Defendant
Hangzhou Yiheda Technology Co
|
|
Defendant
HengJia
|
|
Defendant
Hercart
|
|
Defendant
Hexiang Packaging Co., Ltd
|
|
Defendant
High Pretty
|
|
Defendant
Home home home
|
|
Defendant
Huwennkin99
|
|
Defendant
IMC Shopping
|
|
Defendant
Iaukyu
|
|
Defendant
Independent designer
|
|
Defendant
JandCAo
|
|
Defendant
Jason Store2017
|
|
Defendant
Jayden cool shop
|
|
Defendant
Jdzeyukk US (7-14 Days Delivery)
|
|
Defendant
JiaoLongW
|
|
Defendant
Jlin Shop
|
|
Defendant
Jun creek
|
|
Defendant
KUNGU Co.Ltd
|
|
Defendant
LUMBLEY
|
|
Defendant
Ling Guan
|
|
Defendant
Living By Parise
|
|
Defendant
Lovely-US
|
|
Defendant
Ludlz
|
|
Defendant
Lvliang Lishi District Kaixuan Electronic Products
|
|
Defendant
MAYUB
|
|
Defendant
Maoxinze Official
|
|
Defendant
Misstwo
|
|
Defendant
Moneyla
|
|
Defendant
Morishimas Live Shop
|
|
Defendant
NEFF
|
|
Defendant
NEPLUS
|
|
Defendant
NEW TAG
|
|
Defendant
ONLYONEE
|
|
Defendant
Pandance Direct
|
|
Defendant
PeanutsPaint Company
|
|
Defendant
People's Clothing
|
|
Defendant
PtPade
|
|
Defendant
QKELIM
|
|
Defendant
Qiao Li Pan MK Shop
|
|
Defendant
Qiaochengqujingyinfuzhuangwangdian
|
|
Defendant
RAXCX
|
|
Defendant
RELLO TOY
|
|
Defendant
ROngzhi
|
|
Defendant
Ramiraze Elegant LifeStyle
|
|
Defendant
Rizai Official
|
|
Defendant
Rocky Tumbler
|
|
Defendant
SAKURA TRAIN COLLECTION
|
|
Defendant
SENYURI
|
|
Defendant
SHIUSHING
|
|
Defendant
SHYKEY
|
|
Defendant
SIPSTER
|
|
Defendant
SOFEXM
|
|
Defendant
SanHaoXiong
|
|
Defendant
SenML
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Fenghua Sitong Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Haopaimei Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Hongfu Wuzhou Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Juyuan Xunnuo Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Shenzhen Qianhua Trading Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
ShiPinB
|
|
Defendant
SnyueStore
|
|
Defendant
Socosun
|
|
Defendant
Sokia
|
|
Defendant
SuTo store
|
|
Defendant
SupergoodNo1
|
|
Defendant
TYUANYANG General
|
|
Defendant
Tehtuy
|
|
Defendant
VINTAGE VOGUE 71
|
|
Defendant
VISLAND
|
|
Defendant
VWPARTS
|
|
Defendant
VunKo
|
|
Defendant
WHLECA
|
|
Defendant
XDASG
|
|
Defendant
XYZ Home
|
|
Defendant
XiYongB
|
|
Defendant
Xmxhmb
|
|
Defendant
XuJiaQiangDP
|
|
Defendant
YAWAN Co.Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Yazen Shop
|
|
Defendant
YeFangKun DP
|
|
Defendant
YoJoy
|
|
Defendant
YoungHZ
|
|
Defendant
Yuxuanzen
|
|
Defendant
ZD Shopping Mall Co.Ltd
|
|
Defendant
ZHENG JUAN
|
|
Defendant
ZREGGUR
|
|
Defendant
Zhenliyin
|
|
Defendant
beimeikun
|
|
Defendant
calalilly-4
|
|
Defendant
chengdujiyoujishangmaoyouxiangongsi
|
|
Defendant
chengdushengqinanshangmao
|
|
Defendant
chunxin
|
|
Defendant
cuongeuro
|
|
Defendant
dongguanzhengxi
|
|
Defendant
dressystaronline
|
|
Defendant
dwstrade2022
|
|
Defendant
fadacaitop
|
|
Defendant
fly shop
|
|
Defendant
hjkl987654
|
|
Defendant
hlwenaew9875
|
|
Defendant
homestyles05
|
|
Defendant
huangshengjia
|
|
Defendant
jiangqiushangmao
|
|
Defendant
jinyi9397
|
|
Defendant
kunmingchengui
|
|
Defendant
lililieee
|
|
Defendant
matianling jiaju
|
|
Defendant
minggao store
|
|
Defendant
myposh8
|
|
Defendant
noalng
|
|
Defendant
personalcreations
|
|
Defendant
pinyutoys
|
|
Defendant
segwewg025
|
|
Defendant
shengsuosi industry
|
|
Defendant
tongshanxianhaiyangbaihuodian
|
|
Defendant
top-gift-2017
|
|
Defendant
vaa6137
|
|
Defendant
vigo
|
|
Defendant
vtgdyeww
|
|
Defendant
wiseworldstore
|
|
Defendant
xinshaoxiantanfuxiangyuxinbaihuodian
|
|
Defendant
yang zhi can
|
|
Defendant
ylj_3005
|
|
Defendant
yunxiaoxianjidingbaihuodian
|
|
Defendant
zhijiangshixianzoumao
|
|
Plaintiff
SM LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Artistic Lfie
Terminated: 08/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
BAISHIDA-US
Terminated: 08/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
BSDWORLD
Terminated: 08/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
Balieda Co.Ltd
Terminated: 08/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
Bulletgxll
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
|
Defendant
Daofaith US
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
|
Defendant
EDEM SHOP
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
|
Defendant
JoyfulMart
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
|
Defendant
Likede Store
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
|
Defendant
PARACITY Direct
Terminated: 08/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
QJJ Cake
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
|
Defendant
SERENITY DRINKWARE
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sea Ying Garden Co., Ltd
Terminated: 08/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
Treasure Sky Store
Terminated: 08/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
XComfort Direct
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
|
Defendant
YSC Home
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
|
Defendant
YjIE STORE
Terminated: 08/16/2024
|
|
Defendant
Yogayet
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
|
Defendant
Yueyihe
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
|
Defendant
iDigital
Terminated: 08/05/2024
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 5:42 AM CDT |
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
7 | 7
![]() |