Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Joe Heaton
Case #: 5:24-cv-00505
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 20, 2024
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 4:25 AM CST
Defendant
CAC Financial Corp
Represented By
Bobby G Irby
Morgan & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Tia Cooper
Represented By
Jeffrey A Wilson
Law By Jw, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
38 38 order Administrative Closing Order Tue 04/22 4:06 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 04/22/2025. (lam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 04/15 5:28 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Tia Cooper (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 04/14 1:50 PM
ORDER denying34 the parties' joint motion for continuance. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 04/14/2025. (lam)
Related: [-]
35 35 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 04/14 1:48 PM
ORDER denying28 plaintiff's amended motion for summary judgment for the reasons stated in the order. This case remains on the court May 2025 trial docket. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 04/14/2025. (lam)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Continue Mon 04/14 8:20 AM
JOINT MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Tia Cooper. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
33 33 misc Docket Tue 04/01 2:52 PM
CIVIL TRIAL DOCKET: Docket Call for the court's May 2025 trial docket is set 05/07/2025 @ 02:00 PM in Courtroom 501 before Judge Joe Heaton. Sequence of both criminal and civil trials will be determined at Docket Call. (lam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment General Rules of Court,
Att: 2 Attachment Form- Witness and Exhibit List
Saturday, March 08, 2025
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Sat 03/08 12:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 AMENDED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tia Cooper. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/03 8:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 AMENDED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CAC Financial Corp.(Irby, Bobby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Unpublished Opinion,
Att: 2 Affidavit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Friday, February 28, 2025
30 30 respm Objections Fri 02/28 4:47 PM
OBJECTIONS re27 Exhibit List / Witness List filed by CAC Financial Corp. (Irby, Bobby)
Related: [-]
29 29 trial Exhibit List / Witness List Fri 02/28 4:43 PM
Exhibit List / Witness List Amended by Defendant CAC Financial Corp. (Irby, Bobby)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 15, 2025
28 28 motion Summary Judgment Sat 02/15 2:37 PM
AMENDED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Tia Cooper.(Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1.Defendant CAC Financial Corps Account Notes.,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2.Plaintiff Tia Coopers Voicemail Screenshots.,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3.Plaintiff Tia Coopers April 7, 2024 letter to Defendant CAC Financial Corp.,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4.Defendant CAC Financial Corps April 25, 2024, Dunning Letter.,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5.Defendant CAC Financial Corps April 26, 2024, Dunning Letter.,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6.Defendant CAC Financial Corps Undated Dunning Letter.,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7.Defendant CAC Financial Corps Responses to Plaintiff Tia Coopers Requests for Admissions.,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8.Plaintiff Tia Coopers Affidavit.,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9.Exhibit List in Support of Plaintiff Tia Coopers Motion for Summary Judgment.
27 27 trial Exhibit List / Witness List Sat 02/15 7:36 AM
Exhibit List / Witness List by Plaintiff Tia Cooper. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Summary Judgment Sat 02/15 7:26 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief in Support by Tia Cooper.(Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1.Defendant CAC Financial Corps Account Notes.,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2.Plaintiff Tia Coopers Voicemail Screenshots.,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3.Plaintiff Tia Coopers April 7, 2024 letter to Defendant CAC Financial Corp.,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4.Defendant CAC Financial Corps April 25, 2024, Dunning Letter.,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5.Defendant CAC Financial Corps April 26, 2024, Dunning Letter.,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6.Defendant CAC Financial Corps Undated Dunning Letter.,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7.Defendant CAC Financial Corps Responses to Plaintiff Tia Coopers Requests for Admissions.,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8.Plaintiff Tia Coopers Affidavit.,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9.Exhibit List in Support of Plaintiff Tia Coopers Motion for Summary Judgment.
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Tue 02/11 11:28 AM
ORDER granting19 plaintiff's motion for leave to file witness and exhibit list out of time as follows: plaintiff shall file her final witness list and final exhibit list by February 18, 2025. Defendant shall file any objections to plaintiffs final exhibit list by February 28, 2025.Defendant is allowed to file amended final witness list and amended final exhibit list by February 28, 2025. Plaintiff shall file any objections to defendants amended final exhibit list by March 10, 2025. For the reasons stated, defendant is AWARDED $250.00 out of any recovery plaintiff may receive in this case.. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 02/11/2025. (lam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 02/06 7:52 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit & Witness List (Amended) filed by Tia Cooper.(Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/05 12:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit & Witness List filed by Tia Cooper.(Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, February 03, 2025
22 22 trial Exhibit List Mon 02/03 5:09 PM
Exhibit List by Defendant CAC Financial Corp. (Irby, Bobby)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/30 4:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit & Witness List filed by CAC Financial Corp. (Irby, Bobby)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order for Response Fri 01/24 12:15 PM
ORDER plaintiff has moved for leave to file her witness and exhibits lists out of time19 . The motion indicates that it may or may not be opposed, depending on whether the focus is on paragraphs 16-18 or paragraph 23. In light of that confusion, defendant is directed to respond to the motion on or before January 30, 2025. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 01/24/2025. (lam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
19 19 motion Leave Wed 01/22 3:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit & Witness List by Tia Cooper.(Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
18 18 trial Witness List Wed 01/15 4:52 PM
Witness List by Defendant CAC Financial Corp. (Irby, Bobby)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion to Strike Tue 09/24 3:31 PM
ORDER denying10 defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings; and denying as moot14 plaintiff's motion to strike for the reasons stated in the order. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 09/24/2024. (lam)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
16 16 respm Response to Motion Mon 08/26 5:33 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION to Strike10 FIRST MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CAC Financial Corp. (Irby, Bobby)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
15 15 respm Response to Motion Fri 08/09 12:21 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 FIRST MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Tia Cooper. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Strike Fri 08/09 12:18 PM
MOTION to Strike10 FIRST MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Tia Cooper. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/31 11:28 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 04/15/2025; Jury instructions due 04/15/2025; Voir dire requests due 04/15/2025; Trial briefs due 04/15/2025; Discovery due by 2/1/2025. Jury Trial set on the court's 05/2025 trial docket in Courtroom 501 before Judge Joe Heaton. Motions due by 2/15/2025. Pretrial Report due by 4/15/2025.. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 07/31/2024. (lam)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 07/31 11:26 AM
ORDER the August 7, 2024, scheduling conference is stricken. A scheduling order will be entered separately. See order for further specifics.(lam)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
11 11 misc Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Mon 07/29 4:12 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Tia Cooper. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Mon 07/29 3:56 PM
FIRST MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by CAC Financial Corp.(Irby, Bobby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
9 9 misc Docket Wed 07/03 11:18 AM
CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 08/07/2024 @ 10:50 AM in Chambers(Room2301) before Judge Joe Heaton. Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due not later than by 07/29/2024. (lam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Wed 06/26 3:38 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by CAC Financial Corp . (Irby, Bobby)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Wed 06/26 3:32 PM
FIRST ANSWER to Complaint by CAC Financial Corp.(Irby, Bobby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 06/26 3:23 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Bobby G Irby on behalf of CAC Financial Corp (Irby, Bobby)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Wed 05/22 1:26 PM
ORDER granting4 counsel for plaintiff to proceed without local counsel. Counsel should not assume that proceedings in this case will be handled remotely. Signed by Judge Joe Heaton on 05/22/2024. (lam)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
4 4 motion Leave Mon 05/20 11:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to waive local counsel requirement by Tia Cooper. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 05/20 11:44 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Wilson on behalf of Tia Cooper (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 05/20 11:16 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to CAC Financial Corp. (naa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/20 11:15 AM
COMPLAINT against CAC Financial Corp filed by Tia Cooper.(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Payment for a Civil Case Mon 05/20 12:54 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4436519. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]