Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00020
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 20, 2024 9:18 PM HST
Defendant
Francis Anthony Abergas, Jr. (8)
Represented By
Rene Hermann Heimgartner
R. Hermann Heimgartner Attorney At Law Lllc
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Bravo (1)
Represented By
William C. Bagasol
Law Office Of William C. Bagasol
contact info
Defendant
Dominic Gomes (5)
Represented By
Louis Michael Ching
contact info
Defendant
Leonard Gutierrez (2)
Represented By
Cynthia A. Kagiwada
Cynthia A. Kagiwada
contact info
Defendant
Trish Leila Henderson (7)
Represented By
Harlan Y. Kimura
Central Pacific Plaza
contact info
Defendant
Kennard Hinano Boyd Kekona (9)
Represented By
Gary Gurmail Singh
Topa Financial Center
contact info
Defendant
Nathan Ahhoy Lee (3)
Represented By
Rustam Barbee
Law Office Of Rustam A. Barbee
contact info
Defendant
Faith Michelle Nelson (6)
Represented By
Caroline Elliot
Law Office Of Caroline M. Elliot
contact info
Defendant
Jorelyn C. Pacariem (4)
Represented By
Pamela Ingrid Lundquist
Lundquist Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Margaret C. Nammar
U.S. Attorney'S Office, District Of Hawaii
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/04/2024 1:36 AM HST
Thursday, April 04, 2024
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Anthony Bravo (1) count(s) 1, 12-20, Leonard Gutierrez (2) count(s) 1, 12-20, 30, Nathan Ahhoy Lee (3) count(s) 1, 2-10, 11, 23, 28, 31, 32, 33, Jorelyn C. Pacariem (4) count(s) 1, 10, 21-22, 23, 25, 26, 27, 28, Dominic Gomes (5) count(s) 1, 34-39, 40, Faith Michelle Nelson (6) count(s) 1, 24, 29, 41, Trish Leila Henderson (7) count(s) 1, 24, 29, Francis Anthony Abergas, Jr (8) count(s) 1, 24, 42, 43, 44, Kennard Hinano Boyd Kekona (9) count(s) 1, 27. (eta) Modified on 4/11/2024 to unseal pursuant to ECF No. 43 ORDER UNSEALING INDICTMENT (eta).
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE - by USA as to (01) Anthony Bravo, (02) Leonard Gutierrez, (03) Nathan Ahhoy Lee, (04) Jorelyn C. Pacariem, (05) Dominic Gomes, (06) Faith Michelle Nelson, (07) Trish Leila Henderson, (08) Francis Anthony Abergas, Jr, (09) Kennard Hinano Boyd Kekona (eta)
Related: [-]