California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:24-cv-04178
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:May 20, 2024
Terminated:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 2:21 AM PST
Defendant
Margaret Chinn
Defendant
Pete Chinn
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Sam Benford
Represented By
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T. Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, July 18, 2024
18 18 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 07/18 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Sam Benford. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 07/11 9:21 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On 7/9/2024, Plaintiff filed Notice of Settlement (Dkt.16 ). Upon review of the Notice of Settlement, the Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for 9/13/2024 at 1:00 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal or response to OSC by 9/6/2024, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All scheduled dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
16 16 notice Settlement Tue 07/09 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Sam Benford. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
15 15 misc Response Tue 06/18 12:02 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Sam Benfordto Order to Show Cause11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 06/18 9:57 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sam Benford, upon Defendant Margaret Chinn served on 6/14/2024, answer due 7/5/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon MARGARET CHINN D/B/A JOLLY JUG in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 06/12 8:57 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sam Benford, upon Defendant Pete Chinn served on 6/11/2024, answer due 7/2/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon PETE CHINN in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
12 12 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Tue 06/04 7:46 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (hc)
Related: [-]
11 11 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 06/04 7:46 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/10/2024. (hc)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 06/04 7:43 AM
STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (hc)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 06/04 7:42 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/22 1:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Margaret Chinn, Pete Chinn. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 05/22 1:44 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 05/22 1:44 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 05/22 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Wesley L. Hsu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 05/20 12:36 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Sam Benford. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/20 12:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 05/20 12:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sam Benford. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 05/20 12:33 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37499265 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Sam Benford(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]