Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 1:24-cv-00054
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 20, 2024
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 4:44 AM CST
Defendant
Don Brite
Represented By
Cassandra M. Crane
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
A. Ryan Simmons
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Burdett
Represented By
Cassandra M. Crane
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
A. Ryan Simmons
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Defendant
City of Spring Hill
Represented By
Cassandra M. Crane
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
A. Ryan Simmons
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Defendant
Brent Cooper
Represented By
Miranda H. Jones
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Mary Elizabeth McCullohs
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
David Lester Wickenheiser
Office Of Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Plaintiff
Old School Sales, LLC
Represented By
Zachary C. Lawson
Litson PLLC
contact info
J. Alex Little
Litson PLLC
contact info
John Ross Glover
Litson PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sak Wholesale, LLC
Represented By
Zachary C. Lawson
Litson PLLC
contact info
J. Alex Little
Litson PLLC
contact info
John Ross Glover
Litson PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, December 16, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/16 12:26 PM
ORDER: The Court has been advised that this action is settled. (Doc. No.34 ). On or before June 1, 2025, the parties shall submit a proposed agreed order of compromise and dismissal or stipulation of dismissal. Absent the aforementioned filing or other filing, this case will be dismissed with prejudice on June 1, 2025. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/16/2024. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
34 34 1 pgs misc Joint Mediation Report Fri 12/13 10:12 AM
JOINT MEDIATION REPORT filed by Brent Cooper. (Jones, Miranda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
33 33 misc Status Report Tue 11/26 6:52 AM
STATUS REPORT Third Joint Status Update by Brent Cooper. (Jones, Miranda)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
32 32 misc Status Report Fri 11/01 3:08 PM
STATUS REPORT Third Joint Status Report by Brent Cooper. (Jones, Miranda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
31 31 misc Status Report Wed 10/02 3:16 PM
STATUS REPORT Second Joint Status Update by Brent Cooper. (Jones, Miranda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
30 30 misc Status Report Wed 08/28 4:29 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Brent Cooper. (Jones, Miranda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 08/01 1:53 PM
ORDER: The parties previously moved the Court to stay this matter to allow them to engage in mediation. (Docket No.27 .) On July 31, 2024, Chief Judge Campbell entered an order granting the parties' motion and staying the case pending further order of the Court. (Docket No.28 ) Accordingly, the initial case management conference set for September 4, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 08/01/24. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order Administratively Closing Case Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 07/31 11:01 AM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties Joint Motion to Stay. (Doc. No.27 ). Through the motion the parties request the Court suspend all remaining deadlines and administratively stay the case to allow them to engage in mediation. The27 motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, this case is STAYED pending further order of the Court. The Clerk is directed to administratively close the file. On or before August 30, 2024, the parties shall notify the Court of the date(s) of the mediation and the name of the agreed mediator. The parties shall file a mediation report within 10 days of the conclusion of mediation. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 07/31/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
27 27 motion Stay Tue 07/30 8:47 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Brent Cooper. (Jones, Miranda)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/22 2:18 PM
ORDER granting25 Joint MOTION to Amend24 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Responses re8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 8/2/2024. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/22/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
25 25 motion Amend/Correct Fri 07/19 9:27 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct24 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Don Brite, Andrew Burdett, City of Spring Hill. (Crane, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/18 2:52 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Response due July 29th, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/18/2024. (am)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/17 3:04 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED by Don Brite, Andrew Burdett, City of Spring Hill. (Crane, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 06/26 10:58 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Brent Cooper. (Jones, Miranda)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/14 1:20 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendants' motion for extensions of time (Docket No.20 ), which is represented to be unopposed and is, therefore, GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction (Docket No.8 ) is extended to June 28, 2024. The time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to August 23, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 06/14/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/13 8:47 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Brent Cooper. (Jones, Miranda)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/10 3:02 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Old School Sales, LLC, Sak Wholesale, LLC. City of Spring Hill served on 5/31/2024. (Little, J.)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/10 3:01 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Old School Sales, LLC, Sak Wholesale, LLC. Brent Cooper served on 5/31/2024. (Little, J.)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/10 3:00 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Old School Sales, LLC, Sak Wholesale, LLC. Andrew Burdett served on 5/31/2024. (Little, J.)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/10 2:57 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Old School Sales, LLC, Sak Wholesale, LLC. Don Brite served on 5/31/2024. (Little, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 06/06 9:11 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Cassandra M. Crane, A. Ryan Simmons, Miranda H. Jones, David Lester Wickenheiser, Mary Elizabeth McCullohs admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by A. Ryan Simmons on behalf of Don Brite, Andrew Burdett, City of Spring Hill (Simmons, A.)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra M. Crane on behalf of Don Brite, Andrew Burdett, City of Spring Hill (Crane, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth McCullohs on behalf of Brent Cooper (McCullohs, Mary)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Lester Wickenheiser on behalf of Brent Cooper (Wickenheiser, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Miranda H. Jones on behalf of Brent Cooper (Jones, Miranda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
10 10 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Wed 05/29 1:46 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sak Wholesale, LLC. (Little, J.)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Wed 05/29 1:42 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Old School Sales, LLC. (Little, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
8 8 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 05/22 1:36 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Old School Sales, LLC, Sak Wholesale, LLC. (Little, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/21 1:07 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/21/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Mon 05/20 5:16 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/4/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 05/20 5:10 PM
Summons issued as to Don Brite, Andrew Burdett, City of Spring Hill, Brent Cooper. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (mg)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Mon 05/20 5:03 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Mon 05/20 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Mon 05/20 5:02 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/20 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Don Brite, Andrew Burdett, City of Spring Hill, Brent Cooper, John Does 1-10 (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4082633), filed by Old School Sales, LLC, Sak Wholesale, LLC.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 05/20 5:18 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Alex Little, Zachary C. Lawson, John Ross Glover admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]