Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Roseann A Ketchmark
Case #: 4:24-cv-00356
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:2201 Injunction
Case Filed:May 20, 2024
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 4:39 AM CST
Defendant
L.S. Richardson Revocable Living Trust Dated 12/13/2011
Represented By
Brent N Coverdale
Scharnhorst Ast Kennard Griffin, PC
contact info
Paula L. Brown
Scharnhorst Ast Kennard Griffin, PC
contact info
Defendant
LC Richardson RVOC Living TR UTA 12 13 2011, LLC
Represented By
Brent N Coverdale
Scharnhorst Ast Kennard Griffin, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher M. Hicks
Represented By
Thomas R. Carnes
The Carnes Law Firm
contact info
Brandon A Rotbart
Law Office Of Brandon A. Rotbart
contact info

GPO Jan 03 2025
ORDER granting 7 motion to dismiss case. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed on 1/3/2025 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Hutcheson, Alexis)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
22 22 respm Reply Suggestions to Motion Tue 02/18 7:53 PM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re20 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Brandon A Rotbart on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher M. Hicks. Related [+] (Rotbart, Brandon)
Related: [-] 20
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
21 21 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/04 3:17 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re20 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Paula L. Brown on behalf of Defendants L.S. Richardson Revocable Living Trust Dated 12/13/2011, LC Richardson RVOC Living TR UTA 12 13 2011, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 2/18/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Attorney Paula L. Brown added to party LC Richardson RVOC Living TR UTA 12 13 2011, LLC(pty:dft))(Brown, Paula)
Related: [-] 20
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
20 20 motion Leave to File Document Wed 01/22 11:30 AM
MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Brandon A Rotbart on behalf of Christopher M. Hicks. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/5/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Rotbart, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit proposed amended complaint
Monday, January 06, 2025
19 19 order Clerk's Judgment Mon 01/06 10:42 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Wheeler, LaTandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
18 18 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Fri 01/03 4:37 PM
ORDER granting7 motion to dismiss case. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed on 1/3/2025 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Hutcheson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
17 17 discov Certificate of Service Tue 12/03 4:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by L.S. Richardson Revocable Living Trust Dated 12/13/2011 First Interrogatories and Request for Production to Plaintiff Hicks filed by Brent N Coverdale on behalf of Defendant L.S. Richardson Revocable Living Trust Dated 12/13/2011.(Coverdale, Brent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/14 9:30 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2025. Status Conference set for 3/4/2025 10:30 AM via teleconference. Initial Conference set for 9/4/2025 01:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2025 02:30 PM, and Jury Trial set for 10/6/2025 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. Signed on November 14, 2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 11/13 4:20 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by L.S. Richardson Revocable Living Trust Dated 12/13/2011, LC Richardson RVOC Living TR UTA 12 13 2011, LLC. (Coverdale, Brent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
14 14 adr Designation of Neutral - Mediation and Assessment Program Tue 10/08 4:56 PM
DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL naming Virginia Crimmins(Coverdale, Brent)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
13 13 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Mon 10/07 2:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Brent N Coverdale on behalf of Defendants L.S. Richardson Revocable Living Trust Dated 12/13/2011, LC Richardson RVOC Living TR UTA 12 13 2011, LLC.(Coverdale, Brent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
12 12 respm Reply Suggestions to Motion Tue 09/24 1:57 PM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re7 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Brent N Coverdale on behalf of Defendants L.S. Richardson Revocable Living Trust Dated 12/13/2011, LC Richardson RVOC Living TR UTA 12 13 2011, LLC. Related [+] (Coverdale, Brent)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, September 13, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/13 2:43 PM
ORDER granting10 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Brandon Rotbart for Christopher M. Hicks allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/13 12:24 PM
Motion to allow Brandon A. Rotbart to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9200850) filed by Thomas R. Carnes on behalf of Christopher M. Hicks.(Carnes, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support of Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice
notice Notice of Docket Modification Fri 09/13 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 09/11/2024 as Document No. 9, Affidavit. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event: Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Motions > Appear Pro Hac Vice. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Grube, Cheyenne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
9 9 misc Affidavit Wed 09/11 8:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Movant Thomas R. Carnes in support of Attorney Brandon A. Rotbart's Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Christopher M. Hicks. (Carnes, Thomas)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/11 8:15 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re7 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Thomas R. Carnes on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher M. Hicks. Reply suggestions due by 9/25/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Carnes, Thomas)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, August 30, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss Case Fri 08/30 1:35 PM
MOTION to dismiss case filed by Brent N Coverdale on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/13/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Coverdale, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Tausha Hammett
Friday, August 23, 2024
notice Notice of Filing Fri 08/23 1:08 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
6 6 order Rule 16 Notice Tue 08/20 8:51 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 10/3/2024. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/19/2024. Signed on August 20, 2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 08/20 8:14 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer2 Amended Complaint. Defendants' responsive pleading due 8/30/2024 unless otherwise directed. Signed on 8/20/2024 by District Judge Roseann A Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Hutcheson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/16 11:47 AM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer re2 Amended Complaint filed by Brent N Coverdale on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/30/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Attorney Brent N Coverdale added to party L.S. Richardson Revocable Living Trust Dated 12/13/2011(pty:dft), Attorney Brent N Coverdale added to party LC Richardson RVOC Living TR UTA 12 13 2011, LLC(pty:dft))(Coverdale, Brent)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of MAPN Tue 05/21 12:25 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
service Summons Issued Tue 05/21 12:30 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to L.S. Richardson Revocable Living Trust Dated 12/13/2011, LC Richardson RVOC Living TR UTA 12 13 2011, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/20 4:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Civil Cover Sheet against All Defendants filed by Thomas R. Carnes on behalf of Christopher M. Hicks.(Carnes, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/20 4:23 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Thomas R. Carnes on behalf of Christopher M. Hicks. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9020518. Service due by 8/19/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Carnes, Thomas)
Related: [-]