Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen J Murphy, III
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-11318
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:May 18, 2024
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 15, 2024 8:31 AM EST
Defendant
Robert Gudenau
Defendant
Otto
Defendant
Trewhella
Defendant
Torres-Rivera
Defendant
Roseville Police Department
Defendant
Ripple
Defendant
Nabozney
Defendant
Lastomirsky
Defendant
Houstoulaukaus
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Byarski
Defendant
Mitch Berlin
Defendant
Bergeron
Defendant
Anderson
Plaintiff
Lindsay Ann Duneske
PO Box 274
Roseville, MI 48066


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 24, 2024
service Certificate of Service Fri 05/24 9:40 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re6 Order Dismissing Case,7 Judgment on Lindsay Ann Duneske, at PO Box 274, Roseville, MI 48066 (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
7 7 order Judgment* Fri 05/24 9:38 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 05/23 12:29 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Dismissing Case Thu 05/23 11:26 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 05/23 11:28 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Order Dismissing Case on Lindsay Ann Duneske, at PO Box 274, Roseville, MI 48066 (RLou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Tue 05/21 7:53 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (DPer)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 18, 2024
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Mon 05/20 8:43 AM
APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Lindsay Ann Duneske. (document titled as a motion) (DPer)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 05/20 8:42 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Lindsay Ann Duneske against defendants (DPer)
Related: [-]