Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:24-cv-01217
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 20, 2024
Terminated:May 30, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 5:30 AM EST
Defendant
Elite Insurance Partners LLC
Defendant
Jagger Esch
Plaintiff
Stephen Burdi
Represented By
Mitchell L. Feldman
Feldman Legal Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 30, 2024
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 05/30 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MCB)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/30 8:43 AM
ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 3.09(b) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida and upon review of 6 Plaintiff's Notice to the Court of Settlement, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Parties may, within sixty (60) calendar days from the date of this Order, submit a final stipulation of dismissal or any party may seek to reopen the case, upon good cause shown. After the sixty (60)-day period, the dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/30/2024. (DEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of settlement Tue 05/28 5:38 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Stephen Burdi (Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Wed 05/22 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (EJC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
4 4 service Summons issued Tue 05/21 11:55 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Elite Insurance Partners LLC, Jagger Esch. (JOS)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/21 11:13 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:24-cv-1217-MSS-SPF. (AA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 05/20 6:17 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Mitchell L. Feldman on behalf of Stephen Burdi. Lead Counsel: Mitchell L. Feldman. (Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/20 6:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Elite Insurance Partners LLC, Jagger Esch with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22112297) filed by Stephen Burdi.(Feldman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons - Elite Insurance,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Summons - Jagger Esch