Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Referred: Mark Lane
Case #: 1:24-cv-00529
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 2:50 AM CST
Defendant
Khaled Alsarhan
Defendant
Malcolm Greenstein
Defendant
The Law Office of Matthew Shrum, PLLC
Plaintiff
Ahmad Lafta
3507 N Lamar Blvd #300884
Austin, TX 78705

GPO Jul 31 2024
ORDER GRANTING 2MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Ahmad Lafta. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (cc3)
GPO Aug 15 2024
ORDER ADOPTING 6 Report and Recommendations and DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, October 17, 2024
appeal Appeal Record Accepted and Available Electronically Fri 11/01 2:36 PM
Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re12 Notice of Appeal. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions[LINK:here] (cc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
12 12 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 09/17 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL (FEE NOT PAID) by Ahmad Lafta. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out a[LINK:(Transcript Order)] and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
11 11 order Judgment Thu 08/15 2:25 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations Thu 08/15 2:22 PM
ORDER ADOPTING6 Report and Recommendations and DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
9 9 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Wed 08/14 8:58 AM
OBJECTION to6 Report and Recommendations by Ahmad Lafta (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
8 8 misc Certified Mail Receipt Thu 08/08 10:26 AM
Certified Mail RETURN Receipt as to AHMAD LAFTA of6 Order and Report and Recommendations (cc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
7 7 misc Certified Mail Receipt Thu 08/01 12:55 PM
Certified Mail Receipt as to AHMAD LAFTA of6 Order and Report and Recommendations (cc3)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Report and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 08/01 8:38 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Ahmad Lafta. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (cc3)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/01 8:40 AM
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
5 5 misc Response to Order for More Definite Statement Fri 06/21 3:29 PM
RESPONSE to4 Order for More Definite Statement by Ahmad Lafta. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order for More Definite Statement Wed 05/22 8:59 AM
ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Statement due 06/21/2024. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/20 4:56 PM
STANDING ORDER (dated 02/21/2020) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (cr5)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/20 4:54 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ahmad Lafta. (cr5)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/20 4:48 PM
COMPLAINT (IFP PENDING), filed by Ahmad Lafta.(cr5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/20 4:49 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 05/20 4:51 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (cr5)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 05/20 4:52 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ahmad Lafta. (cr5)
Related: [-]