Arizona District Court
Judge:Jennifer G Zipps
Case #: 4:24-cv-00254
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 17, 2024
Terminated:Mar 06, 2025
Case in other court:Pima County Superior Court, C20240391
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 13, 2024 1:29 AM MST
Defendant
Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company Incorporated
Represented By
Kristy Leah Peters
Littler Mendelson Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association
Represented By
Jackson Kemper Dering
Nelson Mullins - Denver, Co
contact info
Jacob Sparks
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough Llp - Plano Tx
contact info
Defendant
Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Braden Travis Morell
Maynard Nexsen Pc - Birmingham, Al
contact info
Robert Matthew Kort
Lewis Roca Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
Olatz Gabikagojeaskoa
Represented By
Jesus R Romo Vejar
Jesus R Romo Vejar PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Empowerment Retirement LLC
Terminated: 05/17/2024


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, March 06, 2025
55 55 order Clerks Judgment Thu 03/06 8:31 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and fees. (MYE)
Related: [-]
54 54 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 03/06 8:20 AM
ORDER granting53 Stipulation of Dismissal. This matter is dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall bear their own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court shall enter final judgment and close the file in this action. Signed by Chief District Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 3/5/25. (MYE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
53 53 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/03 10:55 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company.(Morell, Braden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order