Member Case
Lead case is: 4:24-bk-90377

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:24-bk-90393
Case Filed:May 21, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
JVIC Fabrication, LLC
527 Logwood Ave
San Antonio, TX 78221-1738
Represented By
Charles R. Koster
White & Case
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Friday, September 13, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 09/13 6:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lance H. Beshara Filed by on behalf of J2 Resources, LLC (Beshara, Lance)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/23 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order for Joint Administration
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
3 3 8 pgs order Joint Administration Tue 05/21 10:44 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 24-90377 Signed on 5/21/2024 (tjl4)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration Tue 05/21 6:52 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor JVIC Fabrication, LLC (Koster, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 28 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Tue 05/21 5:00 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by JVIC Fabrication, LLC. (Koster, Charles)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 05/21 5:24 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-90393 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25302655. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Tue 05/21 10:45 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 24-90377 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (tjl4)
Related: [-]