Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Caryl E Delano
Case #: 2:24-bk-00721
Case Filed:May 21, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Greenwich Investment Management, Inc.
763 Glendevon Dr
Naples, FL 34105-7139
Represented By
Craig I Kelley
Kelley Kaplan & Eller, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - FTM
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E. Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
224 224 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Mon 04/28 3:05 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order on Peter Courtney's Amended Motion for Relief From the Automatic Stay to Pursue Claims in State Court. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Creditor Peter Courtney Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 223
Friday, April 25, 2025
223 223 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 04/25 1:34 PM
Order ON PETER COURTNEYS AMENDED MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY TO PURSUE CLAIMS IN STATE COURT Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-102, Hearing Room, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL . Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Juan)
Related: [-] 131
Thursday, April 24, 2025
222 222 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Thu 04/24 10:06 AM
Notice of Continued Hearing on Motion to Authorize Release of Sale Proceeds Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Trustee Michael C Markham Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2025 at 10:30 AM at Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-102, Hearing Room, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL . (Markham, Michael)
Related: [-] 218
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
221 221 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 04/23 4:12 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Michael Markham, Ben Lambers, Scott Stichter, Jeff Krinsky, Peter Courtney WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: *(1) Continued Amended Motion for Relief from Stay. (Verify Payment of Filing Fee on Previous Motion). Re: to Pursue Claims Against Non-Debtor. Contains negative notice. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Creditor Peter Courtney Related [+]. Doc #131 - Continued to 6/11/2025 at 10:30 am, stay remains in effect O/Stichter - Objection to Peter Courtneys Amended Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay to Pursue Claims Against Non-Debtor Filed by James W Schwitalla on behalf of Creditor Jeff Krinsky. (Schwitalla, James) Doc #132 - Response to Creditor's Objection to Peter Courtney's Amended Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay to Pursue Claims Against Non-Debtor Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Creditor Peter Courtney. (Stichter, Scott) Doc #149 (2) Continued Status Conference - Continued to 6/11/2025 at 10:30 am, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given (3) Motion to Allow Release of Sale Proceeds Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Trustee Michael C Markham Doc #218 - Continued to 6/11/2025 at 10:30 am Mr. Markham to renotice for hearing Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-] 128 131 131 , 132
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix
220 220 motion Objection to Claim Wed 04/23 3:05 PM
Objection to Claim(s)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
219 219 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Tue 04/22 9:42 AM
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Authorize Release of Sale Proceeds Filed by Michael C Markham on behalf of Trustee Michael C Markham Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2025 at 10:30 AM at Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-102, Hearing Room, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL . (Markham, Michael)
Related: [-] 218