North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Martin Reidinger
Referred: W Carleton Metcalf
Case #: 1:24-cv-00151
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Case Filed:May 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 17, 2024 4:11 AM EST
Defendant
John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust
Represented By
Paul A. Fanning
Ward And Smith, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jack V. Smith
Represented By
James P. A. Twisdale
Twisdale Law, PC
contact info
Austin Wyatt von Henner
King Law Offices, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kerstin A. Lanier
Represented By
James P. A. Twisdale
Twisdale Law, PC
contact info
Austin Wyatt von Henner
King Law Offices, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
22 22 9 pgs motion Memorandum and Recommendations Tue 04/29 4:06 PM
MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust. Objections to M&R due by 5/13/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/29/2025. (sc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
21 21 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/11 7:02 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Supplemental Memorandum by Kerstin A. Lanier, Jack V. Smith. Replies due by 4/18/2025 (Twisdale, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/04 8:21 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Supplemental Memorandum by Kerstin A. Lanier, Jack V. Smith. Responses due by 4/18/2025 (Twisdale, James)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 04/04 8:13 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by James P. A. Twisdale (Twisdale, James)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 04/04 10:16 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Text of Order: ORDER: The Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Supplemental Brief is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendant's supplemental brief is EXTENDED through and including April 14, 2025. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/4/2025. (kkb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/04 12:00 PM
Reset Plaintiff's Brief Deadline. (Specific Document due by 4/14/2025) (smm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
18 18 misc Affidavit Fri 03/28 12:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF LISA CLARK by John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust(Stoddard, Jeffery) Modified docket text on 3/28/2025 (slm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits to Affidavit with Index
17 17 respm Supplemental Memorandum Fri 03/28 12:55 PM
Supplemental Memorandum by John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust as to11 MOTION to Dismiss by John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust. (Stoddard, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/21 8:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery I. Stoddard on behalf of John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust (Stoddard, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
15 15 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/18 12:35 PM
ORDER Defendant is directed to file, on or before 4/1/2025, a supplemental brief. Plaintiffs are directed to file a response within 10 days after the filing of Defendant' s supplemental brief. (Defendant Brief due by 4/1/2025). Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/18/2024. (hms)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 11/04 3:02 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss by John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust.(Fanning, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Occupancy,
Att: 2 Exhibit Moving Documentation
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
13 13 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/29 11:33 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss by Kerstin A. Lanier, Jack V. Smith. Replies due by 11/5/2024(Twisdale, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit NC Voter Registration Search
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
12 12 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 10/15 3:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re11 MOTION to Dismiss by John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust. (Fanning, Paul)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Tue 10/15 3:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust. Responses due by 10/29/2024 (Fanning, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
10 10 misc Citizenship Disclosure Statement Wed 09/25 11:11 AM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust. (Fanning, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time Mon 09/23 1:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint, by John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust. (Fanning, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension
8 8 2 pgs order Order Mon 09/23 10:52 AM
ORDER: The 5 Show Cause Order is hereby DISCHARGED, and this case shall be allowed to proceed. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/22/2024. (maf)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 09/23 6:30 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint. All Defendants. Text of Order: ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED, and Defendants' deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is EXTENDED through and including October 16, 2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/23/2024. (kkb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
7 7 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 09/12 12:25 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Kerstin A. Lanier, Jack V. Smith. (Twisdale, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/12 11:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack V. Smith, Kerstin A. Lanier. John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024. (Twisdale, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 09/03 8:24 AM
ORDER: Plaintiffs shall show good cause within 14 days of service of this Order for the failure to effect service on the Defendant John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust. Failure to do so shall result in a dismissal without prejudice of this Defendant without further order of the Court. (Show Cause Response due by 9/17/2024.) Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/2/2024. (maf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
4 4 misc Citizenship Disclosure Statement Wed 05/22 1:03 PM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Kerstin A. Lanier. (Twisdale, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Citizenship Disclosure Statement Wed 05/22 1:02 PM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Jack V. Smith. (Twisdale, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 05/21 2:59 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cly)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/21 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT against John Leite & Lisa Clark Trust with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6526011), filed by Jack V. Smith, Kerstin A. Lanier.(Twisdale, James) Modified All Defendants to named Defendant on 5/21/2024 (cly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant's Deed,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certification of Joint Revocable Trust,
Att: 3 Exhibit Plat,
Att: 4 Exhibit John Culp's Assessment,
Att: 5 Exhibit Shields Estimate
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/21 2:31 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (cly)
Related: [-]