Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Gregory F Vantatenhove
Case #: 5:24-cv-00137
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 21, 2024
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Nov 17, 2024 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
Members Heritage Credit Union
Represented By
Denise Michelle Motta
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp - Ky
contact info
Sophia Nicole Wilson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp - Ky
contact info
Defendant
Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC
Represented By
Shannon A. Singleton
Stoll Keenon Ogden, Pllc - Lexington
contact info
Katherine Tipton Watts
Phillips Parker Orberson & Arnett Plc - Louisville
contact info
John W. Phillips
Phillips Parker Orberson & Arnett Plc - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
Halima Williams
Represented By
James R. McKenzie
James R. Mckenzie Attorney, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
31 31 appeal Transcript Request Fri 04/04 2:37 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Halima Williams for proceedings held on 1/27/2025 before Judge Hon. Gregory F. Van Tatenhove, (McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Court Reporter re: Transcript Request Fri 04/04 3:59 PM
NOTICE TO COURT REPORTER to Sandy Wilder of ORDINARY Transcript Request re26 Motion Hearing,31 Transcript Request. (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
30 30 order Judgment Tue 03/25 3:48 PM
JUDGMENT: 1) Pla's1 Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim. 2) Matter STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 03/25/2025. (DC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
29 29 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 03/21 11:01 AM
USCA Case Number 25-5248 Case Manager Joshua K for28 Notice of Appeal filed by Halima Williams. (KCF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
28 28 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 03/20 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to27 Order Dismissing Case, by Halima Williams. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AKYEDC-6057851. (McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
27 27 14 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/19 2:02 PM
ORDER: 1) Defts'9 ,10 Motions are GRANTED. 2) Pla's14 Motion for leave to file a Sur-reply is GRANTED. 3) Pla'15 Motion for leave to file a Supplemental Complaint is DENIED. 4) Matter DISMISSED with prejudice, and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 03/19/2025. (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
26 26 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 01/28 4:38 PM
MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR MOTION HEARING held on 1/28/2025 before Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove: The Court heard statements/arguments of counsel. ORDERS that all pending motions are TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. An order outlining the Court's specific rulings is forthcoming. (Court Reporter Sandy Wilder.) Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/27/2025. (DC)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Taken Under Advisement Tue 01/28 4:41 PM
Motions Taken Under Advisement:9 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Members Heritage Credit Union.10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted by Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC.14 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint by Halima Williams.15 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Halima Williams. (DC)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 12/23 12:49 PM
ORDER: Pla's24 MOTION to Continue hearing is GRANTED. MOTION HEARING RESCHEDULED for 1/27/2025 at 02:30 PM in FRANKFORT before Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/23/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
24 24 motion Continue Fri 12/20 12:23 PM
MOTION to Continue by Members Heritage Credit Union of Court Ordered Hearing(Wilson, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Members Heritage Credit Union's Motion to Reschedule Court Ordered Hearing
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 12/18 11:15 AM
ORDER: MOTION HEARING set for 1/7/2025 at01:30 PM in FRANKFORT before Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/18/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/05 12:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION for Leave to File by Halima Williams to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Halima Williams. (McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Thu 09/05 12:47 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re15 MOTION for Leave to File by Halima Williams to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (DC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 09/04 1:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION for Leave to File by Halima Williams Supplemental Complaint filed by Halima Williams. (McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/04 1:47 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Leave to File by Halima Williams to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Members Heritage Credit Union. (Wilson, Sophia)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response to Motion Wed 09/04 1:25 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION for Leave to File by Halima Williams to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC. (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Wed 09/04 2:54 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re14 MOTION for Leave to File by Halima Williams Supplemental Complaint (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/03 11:50 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION for Leave to File by Halima Williams Supplemental Complaint filed by Members Heritage Credit Union. (Wilson, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 02, 2024
17 17 respoth Response Mon 09/02 3:52 PM
RESPONSE to14 Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC. (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
16 16 respoth Notice of Appearance Thu 08/15 11:13 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC. (Watts, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
15 15 motion Leave to File Document Wed 08/14 4:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to File by Halima Williams to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss(McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix 1 - Proposed Surreply,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, August 09, 2024
14 14 motion Leave to File Document Fri 08/09 3:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to File by Halima Williams Supplemental Complaint(McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Proposed Supplemental Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Supplemental Complaint - Pavey Correspondence,
Att: 3 Summons Tendered as to Members Heritage Credit Union,
Att: 4 Summons Tendered as to Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 08, 2024
utility Motion Submitted Thu 08/08 9:29 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted ,9 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Members Heritage Credit Union (DC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
13 13 respoth Reply Wed 08/07 1:34 PM
REPLY to Response to9 Motion filed by Members Heritage Credit Union. (Wilson, Sophia) Modified to correct link on 8/7/2024 (STC)
Related: [-]
12 12 respoth Reply Wed 08/07 12:55 PM
REPLY to Response to10 Motion in Support of MTD filed by Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC.(Phillips, John) Modified to correct link on 8/7/2024 (STC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C,
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D,
Att: 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/24 10:41 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted ,9 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Members Heritage Credit Union filed by Halima Williams. (McKenzie, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
10 10 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 07/03 1:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted(Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed Order of Dismissal
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/03 12:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Members Heritage Credit Union(Wilson, Sophia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Letter to Lextran,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - SKO Letters,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Notice of Rights Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Order of Garnishment Form,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Affidavit,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Small Claims Handbook,
Att: 7 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Def MHCU's MTD
Monday, July 01, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Terminate Motions ~Util - Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 07/01 4:23 PM
ORDER: 1) The4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension is GRANTED. 2) The7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension is GRANTED. 3) Defts SHALL Answer or otherwise respond to Pla's pending Complaint on or before 06/28/2024. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 07/1/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
utility Motion Submitted Tue 06/18 9:50 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Members Heritage Credit Union (DC)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time Mon 06/17 4:56 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Members Heritage Credit Union(Motta, Denise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Oder
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Mon 06/17 4:45 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Members Heritage Credit Union. (Motta, Denise)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Mon 06/17 8:41 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC (DC)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 06/14 7:17 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC. (Singleton, Shannon)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 06/14 6:55 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC(Singleton, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued/Reissued Tue 05/21 1:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Members Heritage Credit Union, Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC and returned to counsel electronically for service.(KCF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/21 1:36 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5843374), filed by Halima Williams.(KCF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. MHCU Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Motion for Default,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. Default Judgment,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. Judgment Lien,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. First & Second Garnishments,
Att: 7 Exhibit G. Third Garnishment,
Att: 8 Exhibit H. First Email Thread,
Att: 9 Exhibit J. Second Email Thread,
Att: 10 Summons Members Heritage Credit Union,
Att: 11 Summons Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Conflict Check Tue 05/21 1:38 PM
Conflict Check run. (KCF)
Related: [-]