Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Dan Aaron Polster
Case #: 1:24-cv-00899
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:May 21, 2024
Terminated:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 17, 2024 4:04 AM EST
3rd Party Plaintiff
Transplace Texas, L.P.
Represented By
Clare R. Taft
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
Eric Larson Zalud
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
D&B Transport LLC
Defendant
Transplace Texas, L.P.
Represented By
Clare R. Taft
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
Eric Larson Zalud
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
Plaintiff
Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By
Jonathan W. Philipp
Law Office Of Jonathan W. Philipp
contact info
David Y. Loh
Kma Zuckert - New York
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, September 20, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/20 4:20 PM
Order of Dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice, with all parties to bear their own costs. The Court retains jurisdiction to ensure that the settlement agreement is executed. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/20/2024. (K,K)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference Fri 09/20 4:16 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] The Court assisted the parties in resolving this case at the initial case management conference on September 20, 2024. Plaintiff's representatives, Jonathan Philipp and Lee Cicanski, participated and were represented by Attorney David Loh. Representative Heather Martinez participated for Defendant and was represented by Attorney Clare Taft. Leanne Shinnick and Attorney Michael Lee participated on behalf of the insurer for Third-Party Defendant, D&B Transport. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 1 hour 55 minutes. (K,K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
19 19 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 09/18 1:23 PM
Third Party Summons issued to counsel for service upon D&B Transport LLC. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Wed 09/18 11:47 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Transplace Texas, L.P. (Taft, Clare)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Tue 09/17 11:41 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] Case Management Conference reset for 9/20/2024 at 02:00 PM* at Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (*Please note change in TIME only.) Related document(s)12 . (K,K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
17 17 notice Initial Disclosures (atty event) Thu 09/12 4:59 PM
Initial Disclosures filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Loh, David)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Initial Disclosures (atty event) Thu 09/12 10:57 AM
Initial Disclosures filed by Transplace Texas, L.P.. (Taft, Clare)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
15 15 cmp Third Party Complaint Wed 09/04 12:02 PM
Third party complaint against D&B Transport LLC. Filed by Transplace Texas, L.P.. (Taft, Clare)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement,
Att: 2 Summons
order Order on Motion for leave Wed 09/04 9:22 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for leave to file Third-Party Complaint Related [+]. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/4/2024. (M,CE)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
14 14 cmp Third Party Complaint Answer Tue 09/03 5:57 PM
Answer to Complaint and , Proposed Third party complaint against D&B Transport LLC filed by Transplace Texas, L.P.. Related document(s)1 . (Taft, Clare)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Leave Tue 09/03 5:26 PM
Unopposed Motion for leave to file Third-Party Complaint filed by Defendant Transplace Texas, L.P.. (Taft, Clare)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
12 12 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Tue 08/20 1:14 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 9/20/2024 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 9/18/2024. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/20/2024. (M,CE)
Related: [-]
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Tue 08/20 9:59 AM
Order . For the reasons stated herein, Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF Doc.6 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. The Court GRANTS Defendant's motion to dismiss the First and Second causes of action and DENIES Defendant's motion to dismiss the Third, Fourth and Fifth causes of action in Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/20/2024. (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
10 10 resp Reply Mon 08/05 12:40 PM
Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Transplace Texas, L.P.. (Taft, Clare)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
9 9 resp Opposition Fri 07/19 4:54 PM
Opposition to6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Loh, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Tameka Faulkner,
Att: 2 Exhibit Policy of Insurance No. OC-5846014-04,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Claim, Eaton Purchase Order, Commercial Invoice, and Replacement Commercial Invoice,
Att: 4 Exhibit Bills of Lading,
Att: 5 Exhibit Checks Issued by Zurich,
Att: 6 Exhibit Transportation Agreement,
Att: 7 Exhibit Eaton Supplier Code of Conduct
Monday, July 01, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Mon 07/01 1:02 PM
Motion for extension of time until 7/19/2024 to file response/reply to6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Insurance Company. Related document(s)6 . (Loh, David)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Mon 07/01 3:42 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's8 Motion for extension of time until 7/19/2024 to file response/reply to6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim . Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/1/2024.(K,K)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
7 7 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 06/24 1:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Uber Technologies, Inc. for Transplace Texas, L.P. filed by Transplace Texas, L.P.. (Taft, Clare)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 06/24 1:15 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Transplace Texas, L.P.. Related document(s)1 . (Taft, Clare)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 06/06 12:38 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Telephone Conference held on June 6, 2024. Francine Schwartz, a representative for Plaintiff Zurich American Insurance Company, participated and was represented by Attorney David Loh. Attorney Daniel Sbanotto participated for Defendant. The Court discussed the facts of the case and encouraged the parties to attempt to resolve it. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 17 minutes. (K,K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Tue 06/04 1:03 PM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon Transplace Texas, L.P. on 6/3/2024, filed on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company (Loh, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Fri 05/31 4:38 PM
Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 6/6/2024 at 11:45 AM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Counsel and clients are required to participate. (K,K)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Fri 05/24 8:45 AM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David Y. Loh for Zurich American Insurance Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+] Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/24/2024.(K,K)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, May 23, 2024
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/23 4:09 PM
Motion for attorney David Y. Loh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12573979, filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Insurance Company. (Philipp, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
3 3 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 05/21 1:37 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Transplace Texas, L.P. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Tue 05/21 12:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. for Zurich American Insurance Company. (Philipp, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/21 12:11 PM
Complaint against Transplace Texas, L.P. Filing fee paid, $405.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12568110. Filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Philipp, Jonathan) Modified on 5/21/2024 to add exhibit descriptions. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Purchase Order No. 4355-178853 dated July 26, 2022,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - EnerSys Commercial Invoice No. SLS/43043801 dated July 15, 2022 in the amount of $109,901.00,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Delivery Order No. 7255 dated July 14, 2022,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Bill of Lading No. 840235548 dated July 14, 2022,
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Bill of Lading No. 840235548 with written exceptions dated July 22, 2022,
Att: 8 Exhibit F - Email dated August 5, 2022 addressed to cargo.claims@transplace.com,
Att: 9 Exhibit G - amended notice of claim to Defendant,
Att: 10 Exhibit H - EnerSys Commercial Invoice No. SLS/43076032 dated September 29, 2022,
Att: 11 Exhibit I - First Notice of Loss to ZAIC dated October 14, 2022,
Att: 12 Exhibit J - RRI Survey Report No. 46902221 dated April 28, 2023,
Att: 13 Exhibit K - EnerSys Letter dated December 19, 2022 from Jay Frankhouse,
Att: 14 Exhibit L - Certificate of Recycling dated March 10, 2023,
Att: 15 Exhibit M - ZAIC checks,
Att: 16 Exhibit N - Transportation Agreement
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 05/21 1:20 PM
Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 05/21 1:21 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (R,AP)
Related: [-]