New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:24-bk-15167
Case Filed:May 21, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Oct 28, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
506 Route 17 Ramsey LLC
506 State Route 17 N.
Ramsey, NJ 07446
Represented By
Webber McGill LLC
contact info
Douglas J. McGill
Webber Mcgill LLC
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2024 11:41 AM EST
Accountant
The Meglio Group, P.C.
28 Bloomfield Avenue Suite 100
Pine Brook, NJ 07058
Represented By
Douglas J. McGill
Webber Mcgill LLC
contact info
Creditor
Stabilis Lending LLC
Represented By
Scott M. Esterbrook
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Trustee
Nancy Isaacson
Greenbaum, Rowe, Smith & Davis LLP 75 Livingston Ave Suite 301
Roseland, NJ 07068
Represented By
Nancy Isaacson
Greenbaum, Rowe, Smith & Davis LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 05/07 3:16 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/6/2025 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2025 at 10:00 AM, VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-] 87 Notice of Intention to Close Case. Hearing date if Objection filed: 4/22/2025. Notice served on the debtor, debtor's attorney, attorney for creditors' committee, if any, Trustee, if any and United States Trustee. Objections due by 4/15/2025.Deadline to close chapter 11 case is 4/25/2025.