Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James R Knepp II
Case #: 3:24-cv-00903
Nature of Suit430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking
Cause15:1693 Electronic Fund Transfer Act
Case Filed:May 21, 2024
Terminated:Dec 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 17, 2024 4:05 AM EST
Defendant
Fifth Third Bank, National Association
38 Fountain Square Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Represented By
Sarah E. Sessler
Dinsmore & Shohl - Cincinnati
contact info
Plaintiff
Jill Sawmiller
1613 Victoria Lane
Lima, OH 45805
Plaintiff
Bradley Stubbs
1613 Victoria Lane
Lima, OH 45805


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Thursday, December 26, 2024
13 13 minutes ~Util - Terminate Referral Order Dismissing Case Thu 12/26 10:14 AM
Stipulation and Order dismissing case with prejudice. Each party to bear their respective court costs. Judge James R. Knepp II on 12/26/2024. Copies sent to Bradley Stubbs, 1613 Victoria Lane, Lima, OH 45805 and Jill Sawmiller, 1613 Victoria Lane, Lima, OH 45805 by regular U.S. Mail on 12/26/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
12 12 notice Stipulation (atty event) Tue 12/24 11:35 AM
Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Sessler, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 12/10 3:20 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] Settlement Conference held by video conference on December 10, 2024 before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Plaintiffs Bradley Stubbs and Jill Sawmiller each appeared and represented themselves. Defendant Fifth Third Bank, National Association appeared through its authorized representative Heather Rose and was represented by its attorney Sarah Sessler. Extensive discussions were had with the parties and their counsel, which led to agreement on the material terms of a resolution. I convened a conference with all participants, at which time the material terms of the settlement were recited and agreed to by the parties and their counsel. The parties are to submit a joint entry dismissing this matter with prejudice within 30 days. The Court reserves jurisdiction to interpret and enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. Time: 2 hours, 7 minutes. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
11 11 order Order Fri 10/11 1:56 PM
Order. Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2024 at 11:00 AM to be held by video conference. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted by email to Clay_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 11/26/2024. The parties are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements prior to the mediation conference. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 10/11/2024. (R,Ke) (R,Ke). Modified to correct time on 10/11/2024 (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/11/2024) Order, corrected
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Fri 10/11 2:04 PM
Copy of11 Order, mailed to Bradley Stubbs, 1613 Victoria Lane, Lima, OH 45805, and Jill Sawmiller, 1613 Victoria Lane, Lima, OH 45805 on 10/11/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
10 10 minutes ~Util - Case Referred to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Wed 09/11 3:47 PM
Minute Order of Case Management Conference held on 9/11/2024 before Judge James R. Knepp II. Plaintiffs appeared pro se ; Defendant appeared by attorney Sarah E. Sessler. Case is assigned to proceed on the STANDARD track. Parties to exchange Rule 26(a) disclosures by 9/13/2024. Discovery cut-off dates: Plaintiffs' expert disclosures by 4/4/2025; Defendant's expert disclosures by 4/18/2025; Liability and Damages by 4/4/2025. Dispositive motions by 5/5/2025. This case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay for a settlement conference to be held in December 2024 or January 2025 at the convenience of the Court and the parties. Judge James R. Knepp II on 9/11/2024. Time: 30 minutes. Copies sent to Bradley Stubbs, 1613 Victoria Lane, Lima, OH 45805 and Jill Sawmiller, 1613 Victoria Lane, Lima, OH 45805 by regular U.S. Mail on 9/11/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
9 9 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Fri 08/30 4:52 PM
Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (AMENDED) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. Related document(s)8 .(Sessler, Sarah)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Fri 08/30 4:42 PM
Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Sessler, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
7 7 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Tue 08/06 12:25 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held via telephone on 9/11/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge James R. Knepp II. The conference will convene on the Court's bridge line with dial-in access information to be provided to counsel in advance of the call. Judge James R. Knepp II on 8/6/2024. Copies with dial-in information sent to Bradley Stubbs, 1613 Victoria Lane, Lima, OH 45805 and Jill Sawmiller, 1613 Victoria Lane, Lima, OH 45805 by regular U.S. Mail on 8/6/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Thursday, August 01, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/01 7:22 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, filed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Sessler, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
order Order on Motion for order Mon 07/29 3:01 PM
Order [non-document] denying Plaintiffs'4 ,5 Motions for Electronic Filing. Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/29/2024. Copies sent to Bradley Stubbs, 1613 Victoria Lane, Lima, OH 45805 and Jill Sawmiller, 1613 Victoria Lane, Lima, OH 45805 by regular U.S. Mail on 7/29/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Wed 07/24 11:04 AM
Proof of Service by Process Server Shannon Day executed upon Fifth Third Bank, National Association on 7/12/2024, filed on behalf of Bradley Stubbs; Jill Sawmiller Related document(s)2 . (K,AR)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs motion Order Wed 07/24 10:26 AM
Motion Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Bradley Stubbs. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs motion Order Wed 07/24 10:25 AM
Motion Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Jill Sawmiller. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 05/21 4:07 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued at counter for service upon Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (S,DM) (S,DM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
Att: 2 (5/21/2024) Corrected Summons
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/21 4:02 PM
Complaint against Fifth Third Bank, National Association. Filing fee paid. 405.00. Receipt # 14367. Filed by Bradley Stubbs and Jill Sawmiller. No wet signature on document. (S,DM) (S,DM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
Att: 3 (5/21/2024) Corrected Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 05/21 4:04 PM
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 05/21 4:05 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Tue 05/21 4:07 PM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (S,DM)
Related: [-]