Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: Thomas P Leblanc
Case #: 2:24-cv-00679
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 21, 2024
Case in other court:Parish of Calcasieu, 14th JDC, 23-02642
Last checked: Sunday Nov 17, 2024 2:57 AM CST
Defendant
Ross Stores Inc
Represented By
Christian B Bogart
Duplass
contact info
John F Herrick
Duplass
contact info
Plaintiff
Tyra Cook
Represented By
Jimmy Simien
Simien & Simien
contact info
Eulis Simien, Jr
Simien & Simien
contact info
Caleb Dulaney Brown
Dulaney Brown Law
contact info
Caleb Edward Dulaney Brown
Simien & Simien
contact info
Lisa Kothe Longmire
Simien & Simien
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
35 35 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/28 4:04 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re18 First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Tyra Cook. Considering the parties' joint33 Status Report, requesting that pending motions be stayed an additional 150 days to allow for discovery and settlement discussions, the motion to compel is set for hearing approximately 150 days from the date of the status report. Set deadlines/hearing as to the18 First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses , MOTION for Attorney Fees: Responses due by 8/11/2025. Replies due by 8/18/2025. Motion day set for 8/27/2025 at 10:00 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 4/28/2025. (crt,Crawford, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 03/25 8:06 AM
ORDER granting32 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Lindsey Marie Valenti for Ross Stores Inc. Attorney John F Herrick terminated. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Ross Stores Inc, shall immediately designate new Lead Attorney in accordance with LR11.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 3/24/2025. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
33 33 misc Status Report Fri 03/21 4:49 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Ross Stores Inc. (aty,Valenti, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
32 32 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 03/20 10:39 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Lindsey M. Valenti in place of John F. Herrick by Ross Stores Inc. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/20/2025.(aty,Bogart, Christian) Modified to remove duplicate text on 3/20/2025 (Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/11 1:51 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties file a joint status update on or before March 21, 2025, apprising the court of ability to move forward with the pending motions and trial date for the reasons stated in the attached. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 3/11/2025. (crt,Stewart, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
30 30 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 01/16 1:48 PM
Amended ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint by Ross Stores Inc.(aty,Herrick, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
29 29 4 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/23 3:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ross Stores Inc filed by Tyra Cook.(crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 12/23 3:16 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 12/23/2024. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
27 27 order Order 1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/05 5:32 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER. In light of the25 Order on Motion to Continue, the 12/6/2024 22 Motion Hearing regarding the18 First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Tyra Cook is TERMINATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 12/5/2024. (crt,Crawford, Andrea). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 12/5/2024. (crt,Crawford, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 11/13 9:29 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER mooting19 Motion to Continue. Same relief granted under preceding25 Order. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 11/13/2024. (crt,Higgins, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 11/12 11:08 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Continue. IT IS ORDERED that that Joint Motion To Continue Hearing On Motion For Summary Judgment And Motion To Compel be and is hereby GRANTED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadlines and hearings on the Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Compel are continued, and that if the parties determine that said motions need to be reset, the plaintiffs Motion to Compel will be set for hearing/submission no less than ninety (90) days before any hearing/submission date on the defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 11/12/2024. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
24 24 motion Continue Thu 11/07 11:27 AM
MOTION to Continue Continue Hearings with consent by Ross Stores Inc. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/7/2024.(aty,Herrick, John). Added MOTION to Compel on 11/7/2024 (Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
utility Motions Transferred Thu 11/07 1:58 PM
Motions Transferred regarding24 MOTION to Continue Continue Hearings with consent. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
23 23 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/04 4:20 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re19 First MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion For Summary Judgment with consent sought but not yet obtained filed by Tyra Cook: Responses due by 11/7/2024. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 11/4/2024. (crt,Higgins, M)
Related: [-]
22 22 order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Mon 11/04 10:27 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses from Defendant in Regards to Plaintiff's Written Discovery and for Reimbursement of Costs and Attorney's Fees (doc.18 ), filed by Tyra Cook. The Court will conduct a hearing on the motion on 12/6/2024 at 01:30 PM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 11/4/2024. (crt,Crawford, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Motion Setting Fri 11/01 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:18 First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
20 20 27 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/31 5:04 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed filed by Tyra Cook.(aty,Longmire, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
19 19 motion Continue Thu 10/31 4:58 PM
First MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion For Summary Judgment with consent sought but not yet obtained by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/31/2024.(aty,Longmire, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Memo in Support M to Continue,
Att: 2 Affidavit Rule 56(d) Declaration,
Att: 3 Proposed order proposed order
18 18 motion Compel Thu 10/31 3:52 PM
First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/31/2024.(aty,Longmire, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Memo in support,
Att: 2 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1 Rule 37.1 Certificate,
Att: 3 Proposed order proposed order,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A email serving dsc on Ross 9 12 2023,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B Interrogatories to Ross,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C Requests For Production to Ross,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit D Ross responses Rogs and RFP,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit E Ross supp 9 6 2024,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit F Depo Dwight Towner Excerpts
utility Motions Transferred Fri 11/01 9:56 AM
Motions Transferred regarding19 First MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion For Summary Judgment with consent sought but not yet obtained. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
17 17 motion Amend/Correct Wed 10/30 3:44 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct with consent filed by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/30/2024.(aty,Longmire, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed pleading Plaintiff's First Amended Petition,
Att: 2 Proposed order Proposed Order on Motion to Amend
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Motion Setting Wed 10/16 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding:15 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 11/27/2024 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
utility Manual Attachment Received Tue 10/15 4:25 PM
MANUAL ATTACHMENT received from Christian B Bogart, John F Herrick on behalf of Ross Stores Inc regarding15 MOTION for Summary Judgment . The original manual attachments will be maintained in the division of the presiding judge, until expiration of appeal delays. (crt,Savoy, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
15 15 motion Summary Judgment Thu 10/10 1:59 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ross Stores Inc.(aty,Herrick, John) (Attachment 7 replaced on 10/10/2024) (Chavis, J). Modified on 10/10/2024 (Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order order,
Att: 2 Statement of material facts STATEMENT,
Att: 3 Memorandum / Brief MEMORANDUM,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Petition of Damages,
Att: 5 Exhibit B -Depo of Kaitlyn R.,
Att: 6 Exhibit C - Depo of Tyra C.,
Att: 7 Notice of Manual Attachment-Exhibit D - video,
Att: 8 Exhibit E - Depo of Dwight T.
Monday, October 07, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order - Cain/LeBlanc Mon 10/07 1:48 PM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER Governing Pretrial Procedure: Jury Trial set for 3/16/2026 09:00 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 4 before Judge James D Cain Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2026 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge James D Cain Jr. Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 12/16/2025 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 11/17/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 12/1/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 11/17/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2025. Daubert Motions due by 1/15/2026. Motions in Limine due by 1/15/2026. Compel discovery 1/15/2026. Deadline for filing motion for protective order is 2/17/2026. Pretrial statements due by 2/17/2026. Jury Charges/Verdict Form due by 3/2/2026. Electronic Exhibits due by 3/9/2026. Real Time glossary due by 3/9/2026. See attached Scheduling Order Addendum for additional pertinent information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 10/7/2024. (jud,LeBlanc, Thomas P)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 10/03 11:45 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc: A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE was held on 10/3/2024. Participating by telephone were: Eulis Simien, Jr., for plaintiffs and John F. Herrick for defendant. A Jury Trial is set for 3/16/2026 at 09:00 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 4 before Judge James D Cain Jr. A Pretrial Conference is set for 2/25/2026 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge James D Cain Jr. A Magistrate Judge Status Conference is set for 12/16/2025 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Counsel are to call into the Chambers Teleconference Line at 877-336-1274, Access Code 7066014, to participate in the MJSC. See separately docketed Scheduling Order and document linked thereto for additional deadlines and explanations of those deadlines. (jud,LeBlanc, Thomas P)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 10/01 2:18 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Lisa Kothe Longmire for Tyra Cook,Lisa Kothe Longmire for Kaitlyn Robinson. Attorney Caleb Dulaney Brown terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 9/30/2024. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
11 11 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 09/27 11:16 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Lisa Longmire in place of Caleb Brown with consent by Tyra Cook. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/27/2024. (aty,Simien, Eulis)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/27 9:54 AM
(FILED IN ERROR - DISCOVERY) NOTICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Tyra Cook re9 Rule 26(f) Report (aty,Simien, Eulis) Modified on 9/27/2024 to indicate filed in error (Kiper, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Report Thu 09/26 4:42 PM
Joint RULE 26(f) Report by Ross Stores Inc . (aty,Herrick, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Tue 07/23 2:13 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2024 at 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Stewart, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/31 11:12 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ross Stores Inc identifying Corporate Parent Ross Stores, Inc. for Ross Stores Inc. (aty,Herrick, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/29 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Compliance with Removal Order by Ross Stores Inc re1 Notice of Removal,(aty,Herrick, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record
Thursday, May 23, 2024
5 5 order Removal Order Thu 05/23 3:44 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 5/23/2024. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
4 4 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Wed 05/22 9:08 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/21/2024. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Wed 05/22 9:06 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Caleb Edward Dulaney Brown, John F Herrick on behalf of Tyra Cook, Kaitlyn Robinson, Ross Stores Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 6/4/2024. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Wed 05/22 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to John F Herrick on behalf of Ross Stores Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/4/2024. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 05/21 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2023-2642 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5950967) filed by Ross Stores, Inc. d/b/a Ross Dress for Less Store.(Attorney John F Herrick added to party Ross Stores, Inc. d/b/a Ross Dress for Less Store(pty:dft))(aty,Herrick, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Compliance,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - State Court Record
answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/22 8:59 AM
ANSWER to State Court Petition with Jury Demand by Ross Stores Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #4 to Doc1 Notice of Removal(crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/22 9:02 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]