New Jersey District Court
Judge:Georgette Castner
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:24-cv-06316
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:May 21, 2024
Terminated:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Nov 17, 2024 4:12 AM EST
Defendant
AIKOU FLEMINGTON, INC.
Represented By
MICHAEL K. CHONG
Law Offices Of Michael K. Chong, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NORBERTO VEGA
Represented By
RAMI SALIM
Stein Saks PLLC
contact info
YAAKOV SAKS
Stein Saks, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Mon 04/21 9:03 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 6/20/2025. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 4/21/2025. (jmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement (aty) Fri 04/18 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by NORBERTO VEGA (SALIM, RAMI)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
16 16 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/21 12:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties report that they continue to engage in good faith settlement discussions. The parties shall provide an additional status update regarding settlement by 05/09/2025. If the parties believe that a settlement conference would aid their discussions, they are directed to contact the Court, requesting same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/21/2025. (jem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Thu 03/20 10:03 AM
Letter. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 11:06 AM
LETTER ORDER that the parties shall submit an additional update by 3/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/30/2025. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Wed 01/29 9:34 AM
Letter. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
12 12 order Text Order Mon 12/16 1:00 PM
TEXT ORDER: After reviewing the parties' update submitted on 12/13/2024, the Court directs the parties to continue to exchange document and interrogatory discovery necessary to facilitate settlement. The Court further directs the parties to submit an additional update by 1/31/2025. A schedule will be entered if the matter does not resolve. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/16/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Fri 12/13 2:12 PM
Letter. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/09 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by RAMI SALIM on behalf of NORBERTO VEGA (SALIM, RAMI)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 09/17 2:31 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/9/2024. Formal discovery is stayed. The parties will exchange document and interrogatory discovery necessary to facilitate settlement. An update will be submitted by 12/18/2024. A schedule will be entered if the matter does not resolve. (jem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
9 9 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 07/23 3:27 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/23/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/22 8:48 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Thu 06/20 2:24 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline to move or otherwise respond 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/20/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 06/18 9:36 AM
STIPULATION and Order Extending Time to Answer by AIKOU FLEMINGTON, INC.. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 06/17 3:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIKOU FLEMINGTON, INC.. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/17 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. CHONG on behalf of AIKOU FLEMINGTON, INC. (CHONG, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/04 1:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NORBERTO VEGA. AIKOU FLEMINGTON, INC. served on 5/26/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (SAKS, YAAKOV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 05/22 12:36 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to AIKOU FLEMINGTON, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdg, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Wed 05/22 9:06 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The CIVIL COVER SHEET was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Please email a flattened version to ecfhelp@njd.uscourts.gov for replacement on the docket. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 05/22 12:34 PM
Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jdg)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Wed 05/22 12:35 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jdg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/21 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT against AIKOU FLEMINGTON, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15385235) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NORBERTO VEGA.(SAKS, YAAKOV)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet