Oklahoma Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul R Thomas
Case #: 7:24-bk-80401
Case Filed:May 21, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Harrah Land FC, LLC
15085 S Elwood Ave Ste 107
Glenpool, OK 74033-4046
Represented By
Scott P. Kirtley
Attorney At Law
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
No Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Office of the AUST, Karen Walsh PO Box 3044
Tulsa, OK 74101


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
195 195 misc Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/12 3:38 PM
Certificate of Mailing Filed by Scott P. Kirtley on behalf of Harrah Land FC, LLC Related [+]. (Kirtley, Scott)
Related: [-] 192 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan
Friday, May 09, 2025
194 194 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/09 11:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 192 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan
193 193 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/09 11:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 191 Hearing Held (Bk Other)
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
192 192 order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Wed 05/07 4:20 PM
Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Related [+]. (Corley, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 159 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Harrah Land FC, LLC
191 191 court Minute Entry/Hearing Held Wed 05/07 1:29 PM
MINUTE ENTRY: Hearing Held 5/7/2025 at 10:00 a.m. Related [+]. Appearances: Timothy J. Remy, Managing Member; Scott Kirtley on behalf of the Debtor; and Mary Kindelt on behalf of the U.S. Trustee. Plan confirmed; order to follow. (Corley, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 159 Second Amended Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Harrah Land FC, LLC
Monday, May 05, 2025
190 190 misc Ballot Summary Mon 05/05 2:45 PM
Ballot Summary - Certificate on Acceptance of Plan and Report on Payment of Fees. Filed by Scott P. Kirtley on behalf of Harrah Land FC, LLC. (Kirtley, Scott)
Related: [-]