Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11054

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:24-bk-11052
Case Filed:May 21, 2024

Debtor
SSE Intermediate, Inc.
385 Long Hill Rd
Guilford, CT 06437-1800
Represented By
M. Blake Cleary
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Friday, October 18, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/18 2:07 PM
Order Approving Case Caption Change Order Signed on 10/17/2024. (ASA)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order Fri 05/24 10:09 AM
Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of theFederal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and rule 1015-1 of the LocalRules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United StatesBankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing jointadministration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 casesof: SSE Intermediate, Inc. (1772); SSE Buyer, Inc. (5901); ImpactProducts, LLC (7450); and The Safety Zone, LLC (4597). Allfurther pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all furtherdocket entries shall be made in Case No. 24-11054 (BLS), whichshould also be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 5/23/2024. (ASA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
3 3 crditcrd none Wed 05/22 8:48 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11052 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11603529, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Wed 05/22 8:20 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
2 2 13 pgs motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Tue 05/21 9:46 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Supply Source Enterprises, Inc.. (Morales, Katelin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 05/21 9:03 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by SSE Intermediate, Inc.. (Cleary, M.)
Related: [-]