Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11057

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:24-bk-11071
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Terminated:Sep 16, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Monday, September 16, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 09/16 3:12 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (KAR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 05/24 7:40 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11071 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11608592, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
2 2 order Order-Joint Admin Thu 05/23 2:20 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Dynata, LLC. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Dynata, LLC, Case No. 24-11057 (TMH), should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Signed on 5/23/2024 (AMH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
1 1 34 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 05/22 9:13 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Branded Research, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Wed 05/22 9:33 AM
Judge Thomas M Horan added to case (SH)
Related: [-]