Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:24-cv-00708
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Terminated:Aug 01, 2024
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 24-00002-07954-8 KNT
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 12:43 AM PST
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
William Chris Gibson
Jensen Morse Baker PLLC
contact info
Steven Douglas Jensen
Jensen Morse Baker PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia Oyler
Represented By
Cameron J Pearson
Iddins Law Group Ps
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Oyler
Represented By
Cameron J Pearson
Iddins Law Group Ps
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 01, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Case Thu 08/01 9:05 AM
ORDER granting Parties'10 Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice. Any and all claims and causes of action are dismissed with prejudice and without an award of costs or fees to any party. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
10 10 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 07/31 9:24 AM
Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order for Dismissal with Prejudice , filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Noting Date 7/31/2024, (Jensen, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
9 9 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Wed 07/03 9:35 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/24/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/7/2024, Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2024. (DS)
Related: [-]
8 8 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Wed 07/03 9:34 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/29 9:30 AM
ANSWER to Complaint; by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Jensen, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
6 6 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Thu 05/23 4:58 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 05/23 4:52 PM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
5 5 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 05/22 11:54 AM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Jensen, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Verification of State Court Records Wed 05/22 11:48 AM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Jensen, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice-Other Wed 05/22 11:34 AM
NOTICE to Plaintiffs re1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Jensen, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Wed 05/22 11:19 AM
DECLARATION of Steven D. Jensen re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(Jensen, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/22 10:59 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 24 2-07954 8 KNT; Related [+] filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Jensen, Steven)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8476668
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint