Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Glen H Davidson
Referred: David A Sanders
Case #: 1:24-cv-00096
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:May 21, 2024
Terminated:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 17, 2024 3:21 AM CST
Defendant
Social Finance Inc.
Defendant
Sofi, N.A.
Defendant
Brandon Wong
Plaintiff
Jacob Burbas
Represented By
Mark Andrew Cliett
Mark A. Cliett, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
J&J Holdings and Assetts, LLC
Represented By
Mark Andrew Cliett
Mark A. Cliett, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/08 4:17 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/8/2024. (lgm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
2 2 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 09/04 11:01 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: service of process. Show Cause Response due by 9/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/4/24. (cs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Tue 09/03 4:39 PM
CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Brandon Wong, Social Finance Inc., and Sofi, N.A. (jla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Tue 07/30 1:15 PM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Brandon Wong, Social Finance, Inc., and Sofi, N.A. (jla)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Mon 06/24 3:12 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Brandon Wong, Social Finance Inc., and Sofi, N.A. (jla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
notice Notice of Assignment Wed 05/22 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/22 11:10 AM
COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMSNDC-2390584, filed by J&J Holdings and Assetts, LLC, Jacob Burbas. (jwr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Contract,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet