New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:24-cv-06330
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Terminated:Sep 12, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 3:39 AM EST
Defendant
WELLMED MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC.
Plaintiff
SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By
STEVEN J. MITNICK
S. Mitnick Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 order Stipulation and Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Wed 09/25 4:29 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/25/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Mon 09/23 2:29 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 09/12 5:12 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 11/12/2024. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/12/2024. (jab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Settlement (aty) Tue 09/10 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION (MITNICK, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Mon 09/09 4:04 PM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Motion set for 9/23/2024 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
4 4 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 05/30 11:12 AM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
3 3 misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 05/22 4:14 PM
Exhibit to QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, Civil Cover Sheet by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 05/22 3:30 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to WELLMED MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/22 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT against WELLMED MEDICAL MANAGEMENT INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15387632), filed by SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, AS ASSIGNEE OF HIDALGO COUNTY EMERGENCY SERVICES FOUNDATION D/B/A SOUTH TEXAS AIRMED.(MITNICK, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Wed 05/22 3:14 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: D/B/A parties should be added as an ALIAS . Please do not enter them in the First or Last Name Fields . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Wed 05/22 3:14 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 05/22 3:21 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (kht)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/22 3:29 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (kht)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 05/22 3:29 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (kht)
Related: [-]