District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Zia M Faruqui
Case #: 1:24-cv-01523
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Terminated:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 4:08 AM EST
Defendant
CARSON WU
Represented By
Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By
Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
SHUKRI ABDULAHI ABDI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
HALI HASSAN AYANLE
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ZAKARIA AHMED HASHI
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ABDULLAHI ABDI HASSAN
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ABDILLAHI MOHAMOUD MOHAMED
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
HUSSEIN ISMAIL MUHUMED
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ABUBAKAR ALI SHEIKH
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
M.H.I.
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
M.H.I.(2)
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 20, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 09/20 12:39 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
order .Order Fri 09/20 12:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The hearing scheduled for September 20, 2024 before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui is hereby VACATED, and the Joint Status Report filing deadline for September 20, 2024 is hereby CANCELLED, in light of Defendants'23 Notice of Mootness and Plaintiff's24 Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 09/20/2024. (lclb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/19 6:01 PM
NOTICE of Mootness by ANTONY BLINKEN, CARSON WU (Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Thu 09/19 6:07 AM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ANTONY BLINKEN, CARSON WU (Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 09/18 9:28 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/20/2024 at 12:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. (lclb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
21 21 misc Errata Tue 09/17 11:45 PM
ERRATA by ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED re20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party,.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata (Corrected Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Parties to replace ECF No. 20)
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party Tue 09/17 11:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED, ZAKARIA AHMED HASHI, HALI HASSAN AYANLE, HUSSEIN ISMAIL MUHUMED, SHUKRI ABDULAHI ABDI, ABUBAKAR ALI SHEIKH, ABDULLAHI ABDI HASSAN, and ABDILLAHI MOHAMOUD MOHAMED by ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/17 11:46 AM
NOTICE by ANTONY BLINKEN, CARSON WU(Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, September 13, 2024
order Order on Motion for Telephone Conference Fri 09/13 10:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER denying18 Motion for Telephone Conference and directing parties to file a joint status report. The parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before September 20, 2024, providing relevant factual updates, or advising if there are no updates to report. The parties should attach any materials that may bear on this matter. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint report, each party shall file an individual report by that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 09/13/2024. (lclb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 09/17 10:20 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2024. (ztl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
18 18 motion Telephone Conference Tue 09/10 11:50 AM
First MOTION for Telephone Conference by ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 09/04 1:05 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SHUKRI ABDULAHI ABDI, HALI HASSAN AYANLE, ZAKARIA AHMED HASHI, ABDULLAHI ABDI HASSAN, M.H.I., M.H.I.(2), ABDILLAHI MOHAMOUD MOHAMED, ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED, HUSSEIN ISMAIL MUHUMED, ABUBAKAR ALI SHEIKH. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
16 16 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 08/28 1:26 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, filed by ANTONY BLINKEN, CARSON WU.(Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
order .Order Wed 08/28 2:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), the Court substitutes as defendant CARSON WU, for ROBERT JACHIM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 8/28/2024.(lclb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 25, 2024
15 15 motion Substitute Party Sun 08/25 6:29 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party (Robert Jachim in place of Carson Wu) by SHUKRI ABDULAHI ABDI, HALI HASSAN AYANLE, ZAKARIA AHMED HASHI, ABDULLAHI ABDI HASSAN, M.H.I., M.H.I.(2), ABDILLAHI MOHAMOUD MOHAMED, ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED, HUSSEIN ISMAIL MUHUMED, ABUBAKAR ALI SHEIKH. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
14 14 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 08/21 7:55 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SHUKRI ABDULAHI ABDI, HALI HASSAN AYANLE, ZAKARIA AHMED HASHI, ABDULLAHI ABDI HASSAN, M.H.I., M.H.I.(2), ABDILLAHI MOHAMOUD MOHAMED, ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED, HUSSEIN ISMAIL MUHUMED, ABUBAKAR ALI SHEIKH.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A1, CEAC Online Case Status _ Zakariye Mumin MOHAMED,
Att: 2 Exhibit A2, Declaration of Zakariye Mumin MOHAMED,
Att: 3 Exhibit B1, CEAC Online Case Status _ Abdullahi Mohamoud MOHAMED,
Att: 4 Exhibit B2, Declaration of Abdullahi Mohamoud MOHAMED,
Att: 5 Exhibit C1, CEAC Online Case Status _ Zakaria Ahmed HASHI,
Att: 6 Exhibit C2, Declaration of Zakaria Ahmed HASHI,
Att: 7 Exhibit D1, CEAC Online Case Status _ Abdullahi Abdi HASSAN,
Att: 8 Exhibit D2, Declaration of Asma Ahmed MOHAMED - Abdullahi Abdi HASSAN,
Att: 9 Exhibit E1, CEAC Online Case Status _ Abubakar Ali SHEIKH,
Att: 10 Exhibit E2, Declaration of Abubakar Ali SHEIKH,
Att: 11 Exhibit F1, CEAC Online Case Status _ Hussein Ismail MUHUMED,
Att: 12 Exhibit F2, Declarations of Hali Hassan AYANLE - Hussein Ismail MUHUMED
Monday, August 12, 2024
13 13 respm Reply to opposition to motion Mon 08/12 5:09 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANTONY J. BLINKEN, CARSON WU. (Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
12 12 order Standing Order Wed 08/07 10:28 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 8/7/24. (lcgk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
11 11 order Standing Order Tue 08/06 5:01 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 8/6/24. (lcgk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
10 10 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Mon 08/05 11:47 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re8 Motion to Dismiss filed by SHUKRI ABDULAHI ABDI, HALI HASSAN AYANLE, ZAKARIA AHMED HASHI, ABDULLAHI ABDI HASSAN, M.H.I., M.H.I.(2), ABDILLAHI MOHAMOUD MOHAMED, ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED, HUSSEIN ISMAIL MUHUMED, ABUBAKAR ALI SHEIKH.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A1, CEAC Online Case Status_ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED,
Att: 2 Exhibit A2, CEAC Online Case Status_ZAKARIA AHMED HASHI,
Att: 3 Exhibit A3, CEAC Online Case Status_Refused 02-HUSSEIN ISMAIL MUHUMED,
Att: 4 Exhibit A4, CEAC Online Case Status_Refused 02-ABUBAKAR ALI SHEIKH,
Att: 5 Exhibit A5, CEAC Online Case Status_Refused 02_ABDULLAHI ABDI HASSAN,
Att: 6 Exhibit A6, CEAC Online Case Status_ABDILLAHI MOHAMOUD MOHAMED,
Att: 7 Exhibit B, U.S. Embassy in Dar es Salaam Email,
Att: 8 Exhibit C, Excerpt of Transcript, EsmaeilZadeh v Blinken,
Att: 9 Exhibit D, DOJ Letter explaining AP to CADC,
Att: 10 Exhibit E1, U.S. Dept of State Bureau of Consular Affairs, Administrative Processing Information on December 3, 2017,
Att: 11 Exhibit E2, U.S. Dept of State Bureau of Consular Affairs, Administrative Processing Information on May 13, 2024,
Att: 12 Exhibit F, Li v. Blinken,
Att: 13 Exhibit G, Akbar v Blinken,
Att: 14 Exhibit H, Vajjala Kesava v. Garland,
Att: 15 Exhibit I, Declaration of Rachel Ann Peterson,
Att: 16 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 29, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Mon 07/29 5:22 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ANTONY J. BLINKEN, CARSON WU (Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 07/22 6:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ANTONY J. BLINKEN, CARSON WU.(Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/22 6:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Carilli, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 07/18 11:31 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE for ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 18, 2024. (lccjn1)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 07/19 5:08 PM
CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui for all purposes. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
5 5 misc Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes Tue 07/02 8:42 PM
Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by SHUKRI ABDULAHI ABDI, HALI HASSAN AYANLE, ZAKARIA AHMED HASHI, ABDULLAHI ABDI HASSAN, M.H.I., M.H.I.(2), ABDILLAHI MOHAMOUD MOHAMED, ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED, HUSSEIN ISMAIL MUHUMED, ABUBAKAR ALI SHEIKH.. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
4 4 order Standing Order Thu 06/20 1:35 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 20, 2024. (lccjn1)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 01, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Sat 06/01 9:37 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANTONY J. BLINKEN served on 5/28/2024; CARSON WU served on 5/28/2024, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/28/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/23/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/22/2024.)(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C, service to US Attorney, Blinken, Wu, Garland
Thursday, May 23, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 05/23 8:39 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ANTONY J. BLINKEN, CARSON WU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/23 8:38 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/22 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10915693) filed by HUSSEIN ISMAIL MUHUMED, HALI HASSAN AYANLE, SHUKRI ABDULAHI ABDI, ABDULLAHI ABDI HASSAN, ZAKARIA AHMED HASHI, ABUBAKAR ALI SHEIKH, M. H. I., ZAKARIYE MUMIN MOHAMED, ABDILLAHI MOHAMOUD MOHAMED, M. H. I.(2).(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A April 7, 2024 Declaration of Defendant Wu,
Att: 2 Exhibit B 9 FAM § 504.11-3(B)(2)(a), (before February 26, 2024),
Att: 3 Exhibit C 9 FAM § 504.11-3(B)(2)(a), (after February 26, 2024),
Att: 4 Exhibit D Plaintiffs CEAC Case Statuses,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Summons