Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Case #: 5:24-cv-00910
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 4:15 AM EST
Defendant
James Jackson
Represented By
Matthew M. Mendoza
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Lauren K. Garretson
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Collin Rhodes
Represented By
Matthew M. Mendoza
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Lauren K. Garretson
Calfee, Halter & Griswold - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Babcock & Wilcox Solar Energy, Inc.
Represented By
Catherine R. Gambill.
Kastner Westman & Wilkins - Akron
contact info
Paul J. Neel
Kastner Westman & Wilkins - Akron
contact info
Thomas E. Green
Kastner, Westman & Wilkins
contact info
Plaintiff
Babcock & Wilcox Solar Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Catherine R. Gambill.
Kastner Westman & Wilkins - Akron
contact info
Paul J. Neel
Kastner Westman & Wilkins - Akron
contact info
Thomas E. Green
Kastner, Westman & Wilkins
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
19 19 notice Attorney Substitution (atty event) Thu 03/20 1:22 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Paul J. Neel and adding attorney Doston B. Jones filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Jones, Doston)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
18 18 notice Attorney Substitution (atty event) Thu 11/14 9:04 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Catherine R. Gambill and adding attorney Paul J. Neel filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Neel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
17 17 resp Reply Mon 10/28 4:17 PM
Reply in support of14 Motion for Expenses and Fees Relating to Service, Pursuant to Rule 4(d)(2) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Gambill., Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Mailing Tracking Receipts
Monday, October 21, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Mon 10/21 10:58 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiffs'16 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 28, 2024 to file response/reply memorandum to15 Opposition. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 10/21/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Thu 10/17 11:17 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 28, 2024 to file response/reply memorandum to15 Opposition filed by Babcock & Wilcox Solar Energy, Inc., Babcock & Wilcox Solar Holdings, LLC. Related document(s)14 . (Gambill., Catherine) Modified text on 10/17/2024 (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
15 15 resp Opposition Mon 10/14 4:16 PM
Opposition to14 Motion for Expenses and Fees Relating to Service, Pursuant to Rule 4(d)(2) filed by All Defendants.(Mendoza, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Declaration of Collin Rhodes,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Declaration of James Jackson
Monday, September 30, 2024
14 14 6 pgs motion Order Mon 09/30 3:01 PM
Motion for Expenses and Fees Relating to Service, Pursuant to Rule 4(d)(2) filed by Babcock & Wilcox Solar Energy, Inc., Babcock & Wilcox Solar Holdings, LLC.(Gambill., Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Mail Copies of Requests to Waive Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Counsel's Email Notifications of Lawsuit and Requests to Waive Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Expenses to Effect Service on Rhodes,
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Expenses to Attempt Service on Jackson in Florida,
Att: 5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Expenses to Attempt Service on July 9-11, 2024,
Att: 6 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Expenses to Attempt Service on July 15, 2024,
Att: 7 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Expenses to Effect Service on Jackson,
Att: 8 Exhibit Process Servers' Affidavit Regarding Service on Jackson
Friday, September 27, 2024
13 13 resp Reply Fri 09/27 4:39 PM
Reply in support of11 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with memorandum in support filed by All Defendants. (Mendoza, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
12 12 resp Opposition Fri 09/13 1:58 PM
Opposition to11 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with memorandum in support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gambill., Catherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 08/16 4:11 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by James Jackson, Collin Rhodes. Related document(s)1 .(Mendoza, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A NY Docket Case No. EFCV-24-165710,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B NY Docket Case No. EFCA2024-000085,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C NY Docket Case No. EFCV-24-165764,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D NY Docket Case No. EFCV-24-165887
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Wed 08/14 9:08 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants'10 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 08/16/2024 to answer. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 8/14/2024.(S,SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
10 10 motion Extension (answer complaint) Tue 08/13 8:02 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 08/16/2024 to answer Complaint filed by James Jackson, Collin Rhodes. Related document(s)1 . (Garretson, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Fri 08/02 2:18 PM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon Collin Rhodes on 6/27/2024, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s)5 . (Gambill., Catherine)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Fri 08/02 2:10 PM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon James Jackson on 7/24/2024, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs Related document(s)6 . (Gambill., Catherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
7 7 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 07/15 1:46 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 08/16/2024 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Collin Rhodes. Related document(s)1 . (Mendoza, Matthew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Mon 07/15 1:54 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer. Collin Rhodes answer due 8/16/2024. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 7/15/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
6 6 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 06/26 8:54 AM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon James Jackson and Collin Rhodes. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
5 5 oth_doc Praecipe Tue 06/25 4:37 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs.(Gambill., Catherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons - Defendant Rhodes,
Att: 2 Summons Summons - Defendant Jackson
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
4 4 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Wed 05/22 4:09 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided. (P,G)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Wed 05/22 3:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc. (NYSE: BW) for Babcock & Wilcox Solar Holdings, LLC filed by Babcock & Wilcox Solar Holdings, LLC. (Green, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Wed 05/22 3:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc. (NYSE: BW) for Babcock & Wilcox Solar Energy, Inc. filed by Babcock & Wilcox Solar Energy, Inc.. (Green, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/22 3:37 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12571419.. Filed by Babcock & Wilcox Solar Holdings, LLC, Babcock & Wilcox Solar Energy, Inc.. (Green, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 56 pgs Exhibits A, Agreements, Pledge, Affidavits
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Wed 05/22 4:01 PM
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (P,G)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Wed 05/22 4:02 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (P,G)
Related: [-]