Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jerry W Blackwell
Referred: David T Schultz
Case #: 0:24-cv-01913
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 2:21 AM CST
Defendant
ASR Group International, Inc.
Defendant
American Sugar Refining, Inc.
Defendant
Cargill, Inc.
Defendant
Commodity Information, Inc.
Defendant
Domino Foods, Inc.
Defendant
Michigan Sugar Company
Defendant
Richard Wistisen
Defendant
United Sugar Producers & Refiners Cooperative
Plaintiff
Sandra Kluessendorf
Represented By
Brant D Penney
Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield
contact info
Garrett D Blanchfield, Jr
Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 14, 2025
32 32 respoth Brief (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings) Fri 03/14 5:44 PM
BRIEF re26 MDL Pretrial Order Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Short-Form Consolidated Class Action Complaint .(Slaughter, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A,
Att: 2 Appendix B,
Att: 3 Appendix C
Thursday, February 27, 2025
31 31 order Order/Notice to Attorney Thu 02/27 4:27 PM
MASTER CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al.(kt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
30 30 minutes Status Conference Mon 02/24 2:44 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 2/24/2025: Check-In Conference. Court Reporter: Erin Drost St. Paul Courthouse, Courtroom Video Conference Time: 1:00 pm 1:09 pm Total Time: 9 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Daniel Gustafson For Defendant(s): Lawrence Buterman PROCEEDINGS: Discussion regarding case status. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
29 29 order Order/Notice to Attorney Thu 02/20 4:03 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 9: Authentication of Documents. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 2/20/2025. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
28 28 order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 02/19 2:58 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The status conference set for Monday, February 24, 2025, is canceled given that the parties had no agenda items. A brief check-in conference will be held with Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel Dan Gustafson and Defendants Liaison Counsel Lawrence Buterman only to confirm case progress. Ordered by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 2/19/2025. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
27 27 order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 01/29 3:59 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 8: Common Benefit Time & Expense Reporting Protocol. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 1/29/2025. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
26 26 order MDL Pretrial Order Tue 01/28 1:29 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7: Requiring Master Consolidated and Short-Form Complaints. (See Order for Complete Details.) Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 1/28/2025. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion for Continuance Fri 01/17 5:18 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting in part and denying in part (306) Motion for Continuance in case 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS. The Status Conference set for January 24, 2025, is canceled. Ordered by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 1/17/2025. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
24 24 order Order/Notice to Attorney Tue 01/14 2:15 PM
(Text-Only) TEXT ORDER: The disputes raised in Doc. Nos. 301 and 302 will be handled by Magistrate Judge Schultz. Lead counsel of record must contact Magistrate Judge Schultz's chambers before the end of this week to secure a hearing date on those matters, unless otherwise ordered by Magistrate Judge Schultz. Ordered by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 1/14/2025. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
23 23 order Order/Notice to Attorney Mon 12/16 11:54 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6: Introduction of Master Consolidated and Short-Form Complaints and Extended Deadline for Protective Order and ESI Protocol. (See Order for Complete Details.) Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 12/16/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
22 22 order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 12/04 5:04 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference currently scheduled for Monday, January 27, 2025 at 11:00 a.m., as set in Pretrial Order No. 5 (Doc. No. 265), is canceled and rescheduled to Friday, January 24, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. All other provisions set forth in Pretrial Order No. 5 remain in effect. Ordered by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 12/4/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
21 21 order MDL Pretrial Order Thu 11/14 11:26 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5: Scheduling Order. (See Order for Complete Details.) Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 11/14/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 10/30 11:06 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER denied as moot (41) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-00959-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (37) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-00966-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (31) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-00970-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (26) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01017-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01047-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (33) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01106-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (32) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01122-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (28) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01129-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (24) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01232-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (23) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01292-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (18) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01322-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (15) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01370-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (31) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01414-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01525-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (7) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01560-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (6) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01653-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (12) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01654-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (6) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01812-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (6) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01847-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (5) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01848-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (7) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01859-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (6) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01903-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (6) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01907-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (5) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01913-JWB-DTS; denied as moot (6) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:24-cv-01949-JWB-DTS; granting in part and denying in part (166) Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting in part and denying in part (174) Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting in part and denying in part (20) Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting in part and denying in part (133) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS. (See PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4: Appointment of Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Steering Committees and Co-Lead Counsel, Delegating Authority to Select Liaison Counsel and Specialized Rules, Establishing Common Benefit Fund, and Setting Deadlines for Consolidated Amended Complaint and Response for Complete Details.) Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 10/30/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD) Modified text on 10/30/2024 (ACH)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 10/30 10:38 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4: Appointment of Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Steering Committees and Co-Lead Counsel, Delegating Authority to Select Liaison Counsel and Specialized Rules, Establishing Common Benefit Fund, and Setting Deadlines for Consolidated Amended Complaint and Response. (See Order for Complete Details) Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 10/30/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD) Modified text on 10/30/2024 (CLK)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
18 18 minutes Status Conference Mon 10/28 2:54 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 10/28/2024: Status Conference. Court Reporter: Erin Drost St. Paul Courthouse, Courtroom 3B Time: 1:16 pm 1:55 pm Total SEALED Time: 39 mins APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Dan Gustafson, Shawn Raiter, Alexandra Bernay, Linda Nussbaum, Peter Barile, Dan Warshaw For Defendant(s): Kosta Stojilkovic, Djordje Petkoski, Elyse Greenwald, Lawrence Buterman PROCEEDINGS: Discussion regarding case status. Written Order to be issued. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order/Notice to Attorney Mon 10/28 8:56 AM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Agenda for October 28, 2024 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 10/28/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al.(DMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
16 16 order MDL Pretrial Order Wed 09/18 4:34 PM
MDL PRETRIAL ORDER. Pretrial Order No. 3: Lead Counsel and Steering Committee Responsibilities, and Application Process. (See Order for Complete Details) Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 9/18/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
15 15 order MDL Pretrial Order Mon 08/26 1:43 PM
MDL PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2: Request for Supplemental Information from Counsel, Consolidated Complaint Deadline, and Discovery Stay. (See Order for Complete Details) Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 8/26/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
14 14 minutes Status Conference Tue 08/20 5:41 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 8/20/2024: Status Conference. Court Reporter: Erin Drost St. Paul Courthouse, Courtroom 3B Time: 2:06 pm 3:15 pm Total Time: 1 hour 9 minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Daniel Hedlund, Alexandra Bernay, Kimberly Justice, Shawn Raiter, Heidi Silton, Dave Cialkowski, Josh Rissman, Michael Flannery, Bobby Pouya, Peter Barile, Adam Zapala, Daniel Warshaw, Melissa Wiener, Abou Anara; Rita Wang, Michele Burkholder, Karen Halbert, Mike Roberts, Erich Schork, Garrett Blanchfield, Elizabeth Fegan, Rachhana Srey, Scott Martin, Joseph Kohn, Christopher Le, Sitso Bediako, Nicole Veno, Michelle Looby, Andrew Wolinsky; Arthur Shingler, Dayron Silverio, Peter Prieto, Joseph Bourne, Jessica Servais, Israel David, Alexander Barrett, Brant Penney For Defendant(s): Lawerence Buterman, Todd Stenerson, Djordje Petkoski, Benjamin Waldin, Moira Penza, Jessica Nelson; Amelia Rasmussen, Gina Tonn, Aaron Knoll, Andre Hanson, Jill Radloff, Dan Mott PROCEEDINGS: Discussion regarding case status. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
13 13 order Order/Notice to Attorney Mon 08/19 1:22 PM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Agenda for August 20, 2024 Initial Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 8/19/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
12 12 order Order/Notice to Attorney Fri 08/16 11:21 AM
(Text-Only) TEXT ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. As stated in Pretrial Order No. 1, counsel who will be trying the case or who in your judgment are likely to be involved in directing any substantive aspect of the case should be present for the August 20, 2024 conference. Counsel who intend to seek a leadership position must attend the initial conference. Attorney Dan Gustafson is excused from attending the conference pursuant to the Text Order at Doc. No. 94. All other attorneys of record will be provided a Zoom link from chambers for a listen-in-only option for attending the conference. People using the Zoom link will not be allowed to speak. The Zoom link will be used for listening only. People using the Zoom link should log into Zoom by 1:45 pm on August 20, 2024. Ordered by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 8/16/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
11 11 order MDL Pretrial Order Wed 07/17 9:29 AM
MDL PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 7/17/2024. Associated Cases: 0:24-md-03110-JWB-DTS et al. (DMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
10 10 notice Notice to Attorney - MND Case Prior to Creation of MDL Mon 07/01 12:58 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Per 24-md-3110 JWB/DTS , this case is reassigned to Jerry W. Blackwell and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan, Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright are no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-1913 JWB/DTS . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
9 9 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Wed 05/29 7:06 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Consolidation and Coordination of Actions. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Meet and Confer Statement Wed 05/29 7:04 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re5 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Sandra Kluessendorf.(Blanchfield, Garrett)
Related: [-]
7 7 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 05/29 7:02 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sandra Kluessendorf.(Blanchfield, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Wed 05/29 6:59 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Date and time to be determined. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 05/29 6:57 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sandra Kluessendorf. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
4 4 notice Clerk's Notice to JPML re Potentially Related Case Thu 05/23 10:45 AM
Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #3110 re:1 Complaint. (MKB)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 05/23 10:43 AM
Summons Issued as to ASR Group International, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc., Cargill, Inc., Commodity Information, Inc., Domino Foods, Inc., Michigan Sugar Company, United Sugar Producers & Refiners Cooperative, Richard Wistisen. (MKB)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Thu 05/23 10:40 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan per Related [+] list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 24-cv-1913 (JMB/ECW). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
Related: [-] lated Cases, Non-MDL
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
1 1 79 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/22 5:18 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11067933) filed by Sandra Kluessendorf. Filer requests summons issued. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet