Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Sheryl H Lipman
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:24-cv-02346
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1338 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Terminated:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 2:32 AM CST
Defendant
Eagle Alliance Wings LLC
Defendant
Marlon Friendly
Defendant
Russell Johnson
Defendant
Sam Kirkland
Defendant
Ron Mims
Defendant
Jason Randolph
Defendant
Devolza Walker
Defendant
Franklin Wilkerson
Plaintiff
Boyd Franchising LLC
Represented By
Victoria Young Robinson
Young Robinson Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
7 7 order Judgment Tue 08/06 3:53 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/6/2024. (shl)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/06 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Boyd Franchising LLC (Young Robinson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Thu 05/23 9:57 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 16.2 Thu 05/23 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ADR Compliance Thu 05/23 9:56 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 05/23 9:54 AM
Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/22 4:17 PM
COMPLAINT for. Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4420700), filed by Boyd Franchising LLC.(Young Robinson, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet