Black Ops Construction, LLC
North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Joseph N Callaway |
Case #: | 5:24-bk-01713 |
Case Filed: | May 22, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 17, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2025 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Aug 16, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Black Ops Construction, LLC
2100 Angelia M St
Fayetteville, NC 28312-8397 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
130 | 130
order
Order Closing Case (Ch. 7/11/12 Text)
Mon 01/13 1:14 PM
Order Closing Case. SO ORDERED by s/U. S. Bankruptcy Judge. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. . (Donnery, Erin) |