Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Case #: 1:24-cv-01447
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 1:18 AM MST
Defendant
David Fennel
Defendant
Jule Little
Defendant
Stanley Nelson
Defendant
Etosha Pentarvis
Defendant
HAC/OCC
Defendant
Denis R. McDonough
Plaintiff
Fred Johnson


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, January 31, 2025
43 43 order Memorandum Fri 01/31 4:31 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Denis R. McDonough, David Fennel, Jule Little, HAC/OCC, Stanley Nelson, Etosha Pentarvis. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/31/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
42 42 motion Dismiss Fri 01/31 4:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Denis R. McDonough, Jule Little, HAC/OCC, Stanley Nelson, Etosha Pentarvis, David Fennel. (Kelley, Erika)
Related: [-]
41 41 order Memorandum Fri 01/31 3:33 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding40 Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Denis R. McDonough, David Fennel, Jule Little, HAC/OCC, Stanley Nelson, Etosha Pentarvis. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/31/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Summary Judgment Fri 01/31 3:03 PM
Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Denis R. McDonough, Jule Little, HAC/OCC, Stanley Nelson, Etosha Pentarvis, David Fennel.(Kelley, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of T. Kilbride
Friday, December 20, 2024
39 39 respm Response to Motion Fri 12/20 3:17 PM
RESPONSE to32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Denis R. McDonough, Jule Little, HAC/OCC, Stanley Nelson, Etosha Pentarvis, David Fennel. (Kelley, Erika)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
38 38 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 12/12 9:44 AM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of ECF16 upon U.S. Attorney for the District of Colorado on 12/2/2024. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
37 37 order Memorandum Tue 12/10 3:43 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fred Johnson. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/10/2024. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
36 36 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 12/10 3:42 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara for all motions . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/10/2024. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 12/10 2:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 12/10/2024. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the Parties declining consent under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c) [ECF 34], the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1(c). (ggill, )
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Tue 12/10 1:45 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Denis R. McDonough, Jule Little, HAC/OCC, Stanley Nelson, Etosha Pentarvis, David Fennel All parties do not consent.. (Kelley, Erika)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 12/10 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erika A. Kelley on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Erika A. Kelley added to party Denis R. McDonough(pty:dft), Attorney Erika A. Kelley added to party Jule Little(pty:dft), Attorney Erika A. Kelley added to party HAC/OCC(pty:dft), Attorney Erika A. Kelley added to party Stanley Nelson(pty:dft), Attorney Erika A. Kelley added to party Etosha Pentarvis(pty:dft), Attorney Erika A. Kelley added to party David Fennel(pty:dft) (Kelley, Erika)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
32 32 motion Summary Judgment Fri 12/06 9:43 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment By Plaintiff Fred Johnson. (ggill, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
31 31 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/31 10:06 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re16 Amended Complaint (jrobe, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 U.S. Marshal Service Form
Monday, October 28, 2024
30 30 misc Pro Se E-Filer Noncompliant Mon 10/28 12:50 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE: re:29 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Fred Johnson sought and received e-filing privileges on notice of noncompliance issued. E-filer subsequently submitted the linked documents to be filed by the Clerk in violation of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures for the District of Colorado (Civil Cases), Section I, Paragraph 1.1. Failure to file future documents through the electronic case filing system will result in the revocation of electronic filing privileges. (Text Only Entry) (angar, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
29 29 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Mon 10/28 12:49 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Fred Johnson - Pro Se party consents. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
28 28 misc Reassigning Judge Wed 10/16 4:24 PM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge O'Hara at the end of the civil action number (such as 24-cv-1447-TPO). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge O'Hara in Courtroom C-402. His chambers are located in Room C-452 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2740. (Text only entry) (agryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
27 27 misc Pro Se E-Filing Privileges Granted Thu 10/03 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF PRO SE E-FILING PRIVILEGES: Plaintiff, Fred Johnson, sought and received e-filing privileges on 10/3/2024. All further service will be effectuated electronically via CM/ECF to the email address of record. (Text Only Entry) (lrobe)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
26 26 misc Letter Mon 09/23 10:01 AM
Letter Re: Service of Process from United States Attorney's Office re:23 USPS Certified Mail Receipt and15 Certificate of Service. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Mon 09/16 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Fred Johnson. (echa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Wed 09/11 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Fred Johnson (efoga, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
23 23 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 09/05 9:36 AM
USPS Certified Mail Receipt Return upon United States Attorney General re: ECF15 Certificate of Service on 8/26/2024 (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
22 22 misc Letter Thu 09/05 9:33 AM
LETTER from the United States Attorney's Office. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
21 21 misc Mail Returned Thu 08/29 9:17 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re:12 Amended Complaint - Addressed to Fred Johnson 3006 South Bannock Street #405 Englewood, CO 80110 (echa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
20 20 misc Mail Returned Tue 08/27 8:42 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re:15 Certificate of Service Addressed to Fred Johnson 3006 South Bannock Street #405 Englewood, CO 80110. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Mail Returned Thu 08/22 3:06 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re:16 Amended Complaint and17 Affidavit/Return of Service Addressed to Fred Johnson 3006 South Bannock Street #405 Englewood, CO 80110. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
18 18 misc Mail Returned Thu 08/22 9:08 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re:14 Magistrate Judge and13 Order Addressed to Fred Johnson 3006 South Bannock Street #405 Englewood, CO 80110. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
17 17 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Thu 08/15 9:46 AM
Acknowledgement Letter re:15 CERTIFICATE of Service upon United States Attorney's Office on 8/14/2024 (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/15 8:36 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Fennel, HAC/OCC, Jule Little, Denis R. McDonough, Stanley Nelson, Etosha Pentarvis, filed by Fred Johnson.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/13 4:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re:12 Amended Complaint for Service of Process. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USPS certified mail receipt
14 14 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 08/13 2:46 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 08/13 2:44 PM
ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Richard Thomas Gurley on 13 August 2024. ORDERED that this case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall be designated: 24-cv-01447-SBP. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/12 11:14 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Fennel, HAC/OCC, Jule Little, Denis R. McDonough, Stanley Nelson, Etosha Pentarvis, filed by Fred Johnson.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
11 11 9 pgs order Order Wed 07/10 1:55 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Richard Thomas Gurley on 10 July 2024. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, within 30 days from the date of this Order , a second amended complaint on the court-approved Employment Discrimination Complaint form. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/01 8:48 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Fennel, HAC/OCC, Jule Little, Denis R. McDonough, Stanley Nelson, Etosha Pentarvis, filed by Fred Johnson.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Wed 06/12 11:18 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re:7 Order, Addressed to Fred Johnson 3006 South Bannock Street #405 Englewood, CO 80110. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Tue 06/11 10:53 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Upon his appointment and with the permission of Chief Judge Brimmer pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), this action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Gurley at the end of the case number (such as 24-cv-01447-RTG). (Text only entry).(evaug)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 5 pgs order Order Wed 05/29 3:30 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 29 May 2024. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, within 30 days from the date of this Order, an amended complaint on the court- approved Employment Discrimination Complaint form that complies with the pleading requirements of Rule 8. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Fri 05/24 8:54 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 24 May 2024. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No.5 ) filed May 23, 2024, is DENIED without prejudice as premature because the case remains under initial review.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
5 5 motion Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Thu 05/23 3:38 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Fred Johnson. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/23 10:34 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1915 by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 23 May 2024.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 05/22 4:44 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/22 4:40 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), by Plaintiff Fred Johnson. (blaws)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/22 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT for Employment Discrimination against David Fennel, Jule Little, Stanley Nelson, Etosha Pentarvis, filed by Fred Johnson. (blaws)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibits