California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:24-cv-01103
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Terminated:Sep 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 12:24 AM PST
Defendant
Ideal Tax Solution, LLC
Represented By
Anand Anil Patel
Anand Patel Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Jan Morton
Represented By
Christopher E. Roberts
Butsch Roberts And Associates LLC
contact info
James C. Shah
Miller Shah LLP
contact info
Sydney Finlay
Miller Shah LLP
contact info
Kolin Tang
Miller Shah LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, September 23, 2024
22 22 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 09/24 2:12 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) MINUTE ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL [ ECF NO.21 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Morton's Request and dismisses the action in its entirety. All individual claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court also DENIES Defendant's review to Withdraw, ECF No.12 , as MOOT. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
21 21 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 09/18 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jan Morton. Dismissal is with prejudice and without prejudice. (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 08/27 10:31 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY (ECF No.12 ) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from August 29, 2024 to September 19, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
19 19 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 08/27 10:24 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR by Damon Berry, Courtroom Deputy Clerk to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: You are hereby notified that due to a clerical error the Text Only Entry (ECF No. 18 ) was filed. The parties are to disregard the entry. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 08/26 4:44 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO WITHDRAW (ECF No.12 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion, noticed for hearing on August 29, 2024, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
17 17 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 08/22 11:30 AM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of First REQUEST of Anand Patel to Withdraw as Attorney 12 filed by Defendant Ideal Tax Solution, LLC. (Patel, Anand)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
16 16 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 08/21 1:54 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of First REQUEST of Anand Patel to Withdraw as Attorney 12 filed by Defendant Ideal Tax Solution, LLC. (Patel, Anand)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 08/20 4:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court has reviewed Defendant's counsel's Request to Withdraw as Counsel (ECF No.12 ), as well as Plaintiff's response thereto (ECF No.14 ), and given the nature of the proceeding, ORDERS that a representative for Defendant be personally present at the hearing. This matter is set for a hearing on August 29, 2024, at 10:00am, in Courtroom 8B of the First Street Courthouse, 350 West First Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. By default, all hearings shall proceed in-person, unless a request is made by the parties and granted by the Court. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
14 14 misc Response Wed 08/07 4:59 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jan Mortonto First REQUEST of Anand Patel to Withdraw as Attorney 12 (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
13 13 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 07/31 5:05 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: First REQUEST of Anand Patel to Withdraw as Attorney 12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests Substitute Attorney (G-01). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
12 12 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 07/26 10:07 AM
First REQUEST of Anand Patel to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Ideal Tax Solution, LLC. Request set for hearing on 8/29/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Patel, Anand)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 06/17 10:00 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Ideal Tax Solution, LLC.(Attorney Anand Anil Patel added to party Ideal Tax Solution, LLC(pty:dft))(Patel, Anand)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 06/12 4:05 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jan Morton, upon Defendant Ideal Tax Solution, LLC served on 6/6/2024, answer due 6/27/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kristie Deperio, H.R. Assistant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 05/30 11:15 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/24 3:24 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Ideal Tax Solution, LLC. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 05/24 3:15 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 05/24 3:15 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 05/24 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 05/22 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jan Morton, (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 05/22 3:44 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jan Morton. (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 05/22 3:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jan Morton. (Shah, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/22 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37519177 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Jan Morton. (Attorney James C. Shah added to party Jan Morton(pty:pla))(Shah, James)
Related: [-]