Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Referred: Walter E Johnson
Case #: 1:24-cv-02240
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Terminated:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 3:29 AM EST
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
Parsa Fattahi
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Tracie Johnson Maurer
Jackson Lewis, P.C. -Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Tyler
Represented By
Gary Martoccio
Spielberger Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 08/28 10:11 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING9 Stipulation of Dismissal, with prejudice, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 08/28 10:16 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson terminated from case. (tas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/22 4:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Karen Tyler. (Martoccio, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 07/12 9:56 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William M. Ray, II recused. Case reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-2240-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 7/11/2024. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 07/09 12:33 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Discovery ends on 12/6/2024.(Maurer, Tracie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 07/02 10:46 AM
ORDER - Because plaintiff's amended pleading addresses the issues raised by defendant and states a plausible right to relief under Title VII, the Court DENIES the Motion to Dismiss4 as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 7/2/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/25 6:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.with Jury Demand filed by Karen Tyler.(Martoccio, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
4 4 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Sat 06/22 12:21 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Maurer, Tracie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, June 03, 2024
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Mon 06/03 10:24 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons , as to Registered Agent. (Martoccio, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 05/22 1:38 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (bmr)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/22 1:36 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Karen Tyler. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13453285)(bmr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet