Arizona District Court
Judge:John J Tuchi
Case #: 2:24-cv-01174
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 20, 2024
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 3:22 AM MST
Defendant
Bank of America NA
Defendant
Early Warning Services LLC
Plaintiff
Steven Patrick Smiley
3116 S Mill Ave Ste 107
Tempe, AZ 85282


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
8 8 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 06/18 4:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to7 Order regarding paying the filing fee and no payment having been received, the civil case is terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 05/31 11:49 AM
ORDER denying the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc.2 ). Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee of $402.00 within 14 days of the date of this Order or this action will be terminated. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action without further notice or Order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to pay the Court's filing fee within the time stated above. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/30/2024. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
4 4 service Summons Submitted Wed 05/22 11:47 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Steven Patrick Smiley. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
6 6 misc Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Wed 05/22 11:50 AM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (KJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc New Case Opened Wed 05/22 11:49 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01174 PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KJ)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing Wed 05/22 11:46 AM
REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Steven Patrick Smiley. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (KJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/22 11:44 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Steven Patrick Smiley. (KJ)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/22 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Steven Patrick Smiley.(KJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope