California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:24-cv-04093
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 12, 2024 12:26 AM PST
Defendant
Susan Curda
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Christopher B. Buchanan
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
Mingzhi Xiao
4191 Via Viola
Montclair, CA 91763


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
10 10 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)) Wed 08/14 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) or (c) filed by plaintiff Mingzhi Xiao. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
9 9 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 07/16 10:43 AM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Susan Curda answer now due 8/15/2024, re Complaint - (Discovery),1 filed by Defendant Susan Curda.(Attorney Christopher B. Buchanan added to party Susan Curda(pty:dft))(Buchanan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Proof of Service
Monday, June 24, 2024
8 8 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Tue 06/25 1:33 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Mingzhi Xiao, upon Defendant Susan Curda served on 5/17/2024, answer due 7/16/2024. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by personal service. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
7 7 10 pgs order Order Wed 05/22 4:57 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
6 6 15 pgs order Order Wed 05/22 4:54 PM
SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. One or more of the parties to this action has elected to appear pro se. Persons appearing before this Court are not required to retain the services of a lawyer or obtain the advice of counsel. Individual litigants may represent themselves pro se, but corporations and associations must be represented by counsel. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 05/22 11:59 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 05/22 11:58 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 05/22 11:57 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mingzhi Xiao. (ghap)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 05/22 11:54 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Susan Curda. (ghap)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 05/22 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT against Defendant Susan Curda. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S Christensen.(Filing fee $ 405:PAID), filed by plaintiff Mingzhi Xiao. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-71