Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-mb-08116
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Terminated:Feb 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 23, 2024 12:45 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Search Warrant (1)
Terminated: 02/23/2024


Docket last updated: 05/23/2024 1:36 AM MST
Friday, February 23, 2024
1 1 SEARCH AND SEIZURE WARRANT ISSUED for United States Postal Service Parcel, Tracking Number: EI 937 867 986 US, addressed to 1805 N. 87th Dr., Phoenix, AZ 85037. Ryan McCarthy appearing for USA. (MAP)
Related: [-]