Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 23, 2024 3:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Jesus Escamilla (1)
Represented By
Samuel J. Randall, IV
Randall & Stump, PLLC
contact info
David E. Wicclair
Federal Public Defender - Ednc
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ashley H Foxx
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/12/2025 7:50 PM EDT
Friday, February 23, 2024
1 1 4 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Jesus Escamilla (1) counts 1, 2. The foreperson's signature has been redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act. The unredacted version of this document has been filed under seal. (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs MOTION to Seal1 Indictment (Sealed) filed by USA as to Jesus Escamilla. (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal as to Jesus Escamilla (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/23/2024. (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
4 4 Unredacted Document1 Indictment (Sealed) (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs Warrant Requested by USA as to Jesus Escamilla. (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant Issued by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court in case as to Jesus Escamilla. Original to US Marshal's Office for service. (Pendergrass, C)
Related: [-]
7 7 Penalty Sheet (Selected Participants Only) as to Jesus Escamilla (Pendergrass, C) (Pendergrass, C).
Related: [-]