Original Case: 0:23-cv-03423

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-02063
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Terminated:Jul 10, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jul 11, 2024 4:36 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Dr. Jason A. Ziemer
Represented By
Nicholas Andrew Rauch
LARSON & KING
contact info
Madison Fernandez
LARSON & KING
contact info
Pat Henry O'Neill III
LARSON & KING
contact info
Mark A. Solheim
LARSON & KING
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Park Dental Maplewood
Represented By
Nicholas Andrew Rauch
LARSON & KING
contact info
Madison Fernandez
LARSON & KING
contact info
Pat Henry O'Neill III
LARSON & KING
contact info
Mark A. Solheim
LARSON & KING
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
UCare Minnesota
Represented By
David Jean Warden
NILAN & JOHNSON
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Delta Dental Plan of Minnesota
Represented By
Sarah Elisabeth Bushnell
ARTHUR & CHAPMAN
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Markowitz
ARTHUR & CHAPMAN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Babatunde A. Reuben
Represented By
Babatunde A. Reuben
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/11/2024 4:36 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
Civil case docketed. [5396550] 24-2063 (ASL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs ProSe Docketing Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs ProSe NDA
24 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 5/20/2024, Order filed 5/1/2024, Judgment filed 5/1/2024, and docket entries, [5396577] 24-2063 (ASL)
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK ORDER: The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 06/12/2024, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [5396579] 24-2063 (ASL)
Related: [-]