New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Joseph N Laplante
Case #: 1:24-cv-00149
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 23, 2024
Terminated:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2024 3:27 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Founders Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael J. Rossi
Conn Kavanaugh Rosenthal Peisch & Ford, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Helloswan, LLC
Represented By
Roy W. Tilsley, Jr.
Bernstein Shur PA
contact info
Matthew Joseph Delude
Bernstein Shur Sawyer & Nelson
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Defendant
Helloswan, LLC
Terminated: 06/26/2024
Represented By
Roy W. Tilsley, Jr.
Bernstein Shur PA
contact info
Matthew Joseph Delude
Bernstein Shur Sawyer & Nelson
contact info
Defendant
Founders Insurance Company
Terminated: 06/26/2024
Represented By
Michael J. Rossi
Conn Kavanaugh Rosenthal Peisch & Ford, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss Wed 06/26 1:57 PM
Joint Assented to MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Counterclaim without Prejudice filed by Helloswan, LLC.(Delude, Matthew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 06/26 5:00 PM
///ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Joint Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Counterclaim without Prejudice. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 07/03 7:49 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice - Filing Due Tue 06/25 12:44 PM
Clerk's Notice - No Diversity Statement filed. The plaintiff is directed to file a diversity statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 on or before 7/2/2024. (jb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer Fri 06/21 11:51 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 5, 2024. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 7/5/2024.(jb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
7 7 motion Extend Time to Answer Thu 06/20 4:10 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 5, 2024 filed by Helloswan, LLC.(Delude, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 06/20 4:08 PM
Disclosure Statement by Helloswan, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Delude, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 06/20 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Joseph Delude on behalf of Helloswan, LLC (Delude, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
4 4 misc State Court Record Fri 06/07 1:21 PM
Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 215-2024-CV-00089, Grafton County Superior Court(Rossi, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Clerk's Notice - Filing Due Fri 06/07 7:45 AM
Clerk's Notice - No State Court Record filed. The removing party shall file the state court record within fourteen (14) days of this notice. (jb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 06/03 10:19 AM
Disclosure Statement by Founders Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Rossi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 05/30 2:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Helloswan, LLC with jury demand filed by Founders Insurance Company.(Rossi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Underlying Lawsuit,
Att: 2 Exhibit Founders Policy
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
notice Notice - ECF Wed 05/29 9:36 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website[LINK:HERE] .(mc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Error Wed 05/29 9:37 AM
NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Founders Insurance Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Founders Insurnace Company shall file a disclosure statement by June 5, 2024. (mc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Error Wed 05/29 9:38 AM
NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Founders Insurance Company. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Helloswan, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by June 19, 2024. Disclosure Statement due 6/19/2024. (mc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal - New Case Thu 05/23 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Grafton Superior Court, case number 215-2024-CV-00089 (filing fee $405, receipt number ANHDC-2514151) filed by Founders Insurance Company. Answer Follow Up on 6/13/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 6/6/2024.(Rossi, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Writ of Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Counsel,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned Wed 05/29 9:35 AM
Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-149-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
Related: [-]