Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:24-cv-00543
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 23, 2024
Case in other court:25th Judicial District Court, Gonzales County, TX, 28,776
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2024 2:59 AM CST
Defendant
Spruce Trucking, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Wright
Fee, Smith & Sharp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Roehr
Represented By
Dannick Graciela Villasenor-Hernandez
Espinoza Law Firm
contact info
Lara McDonald Brock
Espinoza & Brock, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/21 11:27 AM
ORDER RESETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, (Final Pretrial Conference reset for 9/9/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (vl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/09 2:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Selection set for 9/15/2025 9:00AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Trial set for 9/15/2025 9:00 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 6/17/2025, ADR Mediation Completed by 6/17/2025, Discovery due by 6/2/2025, Motions due by 6/17/2025,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rqr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
15 15 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 04/08 5:17 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Anthony Roehr. (Villasenor-Hernandez, Dannick)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 04/07 10:40 AM
Text Order GRANTING14 Motion to Continue entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Accordingly, the Court vacates the pre-trial conference scheduled for April 8, 2025, and the trial setting scheduled for April 21, 2025. The parties are directed to submit an amended scheduling order by April 16, 2025, that proposes a new trial date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mmlc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
14 14 motion Continue Fri 04/04 4:47 PM
Agreed MOTION to Continue by Anthony Roehr. (Villasenor-Hernandez, Dannick)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/04 1:54 PM
ORDER RESETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Pretrial Conference reset for 4/8/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez,). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rqr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
12 12 trial Witness List Fri 02/28 3:17 PM
Witness List by Spruce Trucking, LLC. (Wright, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 trial Exhibit List Fri 02/28 3:16 PM
Exhibit List Defendant's by Spruce Trucking, LLC.. (Wright, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
10 10 minutes Status Conference Fri 08/09 10:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Xavier Rodriguez: Status Conference held on 8/8/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Gigi Simcox.)(mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/28 9:26 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 4/21/2025 9:00AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. ADR Report Deadline due by 11/26/2024. ADR Mediation Completed by 11/26/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2024. Discovery due by 11/26/2024. Motions due by 12/18/2024.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rqr)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 06/28 9:20 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS (Status Conference set for 8/8/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez.). Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rqr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
7 7 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Wed 06/26 10:12 AM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint by Spruce Trucking, LLC.(Wright, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Agreed SO
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
6 6 misc Advisory to the Court Tue 06/25 11:24 AM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Anthony Roehr . (Villasenor-Hernandez, Dannick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
5 5 9 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial Thu 05/30 11:10 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/26/2024,), Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order Thu 05/30 11:05 AM
STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
3 3 misc Attachment Thu 05/23 11:21 AM
ATTACHMENT JS-44 Supplemental to1 Notice of Removal by Spruce Trucking, LLC. (Wright, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Thu 05/23 9:09 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Spruce Trucking, LLC. (Wright, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/23 9:08 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Spruce Trucking, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-18797936), filed by Spruce Trucking, LLC.(Wright, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings,
Att: 3 Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/28 7:42 AM
Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Tue 05/28 7:43 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
Related: [-]