New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:24-cv-06365
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2024 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS
Defendant
JOHNSON AND JOHNSON
Represented By
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC
Defendant
JOHNSON AND JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC
Defendant
KENVUE, INC.
Defendant
LLT MANAGEMENT, LLC
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
GLORIA JOHNSON-TURNER
Represented By
AMY ESKIN
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/02 7:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON AND JOHNSON (SHARKO, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 05/24 11:32 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC, KENVUE, INC., LLT MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (amv)
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Fri 05/24 11:33 AM
Member Case Direct File on 5/23/2024, for MDL 2738. (amv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/23 11:11 AM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC, KENVUE, INC., LLT MANAGEMENT, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15390595) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GLORIA JOHNSON-TURNER.(ESKIN, AMY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet