Utah District Court
Judge:Ted Stewart
Case #: 2:24-cv-00370
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Terminated:Apr 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 1:42 AM MST
Defendant
Home Depot
Defendant
Penske Truck Rental
Plaintiff
Mark Daniel Switzer
16555 VAN WAGONER RD
SPRING LAKE, MI 49456

GPO Apr 01 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 Complaint, filed by Mark Daniel Switzer, 29 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. The parties must file any objections to this Report and Recommendation within 14 days after being served with a copy of it. Failure to object may constitute waiver of objections upon subsequent review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 4/1/2025. (alf)
GPO Apr 21 2025
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ADOPTING 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Penske's 29 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the action is DISMISSED with prejudice as to Home Depot pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/21/2025. (mh)

Docket last updated: 63 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
56 56 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 04/30 1:39 PM
USCA Case Number - Case Appealed to USCA Tenth Circuit Case Number 25-4052 for53 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Mark Daniel Switzer. (jwt)
Related: [-]
55 55 appeal Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA Wed 04/30 9:39 AM
Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA re53 Notice of Appeal.(jrj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Appendix
54 54 appeal Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA Wed 04/30 9:13 AM
Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA re53 Notice of Appeal.(jrj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
Monday, April 28, 2025
53 53 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 04/30 8:41 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to51 Memorandum Decision and Order on Report and Recommendations,52 Judgment, filed by Mark Daniel Switzer. Appeals to the USCA for the 10th Circuit. Fee Status: IFP Granted.(mh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Penske's Strategy to Treat It's truck accident victim's unfairly,
Att: 2 Reconsideration of Settlement asked for based upon Extensive Medical Injuries Ect,
Att: 3 Motion for appeal to 10th Circuit Court of Appeals,
Att: 4 Utah Accident Law Unfair Settlement Prepared by Chartwell Law,
Att: 5 Truck Accidents vs Car Accidents,
Att: 6 Penske to pay $3.5 mil to Mass A G,
Att: 7 Penske Truck Accident Claim Settlements by Miller and Zois,
Att: 8 Penske strategy to avoid paying fair truck accident settlements,
Att: 9 Penske Truck Rental Accidents and Settlements,
Att: 10 Penske Truck Accident Claim Settlements,
Att: 11 St. Marks Bill from October 21 2022,
Att: 12 Medicare Letter dated November 15-2024 regarding 10 31-2022 St Marks back surgery