New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jamel K Semper
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:24-cv-06377
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:May 23, 2024
Terminated:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2024 3:44 AM EST
Defendant
BIG 5 CORP.
Represented By
BRUCE R. EWING
Dorsey & Whitney, LLP
contact info
Defendant
BLUESTAR ALLIANCE LLC
Represented By
BRUCE R. EWING
Dorsey & Whitney, LLP
contact info
Defendant
CONQUEST SPORT GROUP LLC
Represented By
BRUCE R. EWING
Dorsey & Whitney, LLP
contact info
Defendant
HOME GOODS LLC
Represented By
BRUCE R. EWING
Dorsey & Whitney, LLP
contact info
Defendant
HRLY BRAND HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By
BRUCE R. EWING
Dorsey & Whitney, LLP
contact info
Defendant
THE TJX COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By
BRUCE R. EWING
Dorsey & Whitney, LLP
contact info
Notice Only
PHV JEREMY BERMAN
Notice Only
PHV KIERAN G. DOYLE
Plaintiff
BOGG BAG, INC.
Represented By
LEAH KELMAN
Herrick Feinstein LLP
contact info
ELIZABETH A. MANCUSO
Herrick, Feinstein LLP
contact info
CLARENCE JOHN ERICKSON
Cowan, Liebowitz & Latman, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 24, 2025
58 58 order Stipulation and Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Mon 03/24 11:58 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 3/24/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
57 57 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Thu 03/20 4:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by BOGG BAG, INC.. (KELMAN, LEAH)
Related: [-]