Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Greg Gerard Guidry
Referred: Eva J Dossier
Case #: 2:24-cv-01354
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:May 23, 2024
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Case in other court:Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, 24-01221 "F-14"
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2024 2:33 AM CST
Defendant
Raiser, LLC
Represented By
Caroline M. Murley
Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, Aplc (new Orleans)
contact info
Jonathan B. Womack
Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe Aplc
contact info
Jared A. Davidson
Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe Aplc
contact info
Paula Marcello Wellons
Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Caroline M. Murley
Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, Aplc (new Orleans)
contact info
Jonathan B. Womack
Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe Aplc
contact info
Jared A. Davidson
Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe Aplc
contact info
Paula Marcello Wellons
Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe Aplc
contact info
Defendant
United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By
Ryan David Kelley
Hebbler & Giordano, LLC
contact info
Michael E. Escudier
Hebbler & Giordano, LLC
contact info
Sarah Elizabeth Skidmore
Hebbler & Giordano, LLC
contact info
Dianna Duffy Willem
Hebbler & Giordano, LLC
contact info
Michael D. Cangelosi
Hebbler & Giordano, LLC
contact info
Brian Thomas Hill
Hebbler & Giordano, LLC
contact info
Travis John Beslin
Hebbler & Giordano, LLC
contact info
Charles V. Giordano
Hebbler & Giordano, LLC
contact info
Jairo F. Sanchez
Hebbler & Giordano, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London
Represented By
Allyson Barre Colomb
Frilot LLC
contact info
Robert Patrick Ray
Frilot L.L.C.
contact info
Danica Benbow Denny
Frilot LLC
contact info
Patrick J. McShane
Frilot L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Santo Guerrera
Represented By
Thomas J. Corrington
Corrington Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lloyds of London - Hiscox Syndicate 33
Terminated: 09/06/2024

GPO Feb 18 2025
ORDER AND REASONS that 13 Motion to Dismiss and 15 Motion for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 12 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 53 Motion to Certify to the Louisiana Supreme Court is DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED that 62 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 2/18/2025. (lag)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
82 82 appeal USCA Order Thu 05/08 4:48 PM
ORDER of USCA as to77 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed for want of prosecution. By USCA Clerk.(lag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal letter