Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:24-cv-00382
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 23, 2024
Terminated:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2024 2:35 AM CST
Defendant
BVNK Services Limited
Represented By
Bruce Charles Morris
Kane Russell Coleman & Logan Pc Houston
contact info
Plaintiff
Intercurrency Software LLC
Represented By
Christopher A Honea
Garteiser Honea PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
10 10 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 10/23 9:57 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (NKL)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/23 9:56 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/22/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/18 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Intercurrency Software LLC(Honea, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/18 4:56 PM
ORDER granting6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint - BVNK Services Limited's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint BVNK Services Limited answer due 10/21/2024. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/18/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 09/17 4:32 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint - BVNK Services Limited's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by BVNK Services Limited.(Morris, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 08/13 8:22 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for BVNK Services Limited to 9/19/2024. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(NKL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
5 5 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 08/12 4:54 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Intercurrency Software LLC.(Honea, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/12 4:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intercurrency Software LLC. BVNK Services Limited served on 6/11/2024. (Garteiser, Randall)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 06/07 2:49 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to BVNK Services Limited c/o 89 Charterhouse Street, Third Floor. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/24 7:13 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 05/24 7:14 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 05/23 4:46 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Honea, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/23 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against BVNK Services Limited ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10155399.), filed by Intercurrency Software LLC.(Honea, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet